Original Case: 4:16-cv-05023

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-35775
Typecivil / united states
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2016
Terminated:Jul 24, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Jul 26, 2018 1:38 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE
Represented By
Charles J. Butler
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Arthur Thomas Catterall
DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Ivan Clay Dale
DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DONALD J. TAYLOR, an individual and citizen of the State of Washington
Represented By
Charles Hammer
Charles H. Hammer
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/26/2018 1:32 AM PDT
Monday, September 26, 2016
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/03/2016. Transcript ordered by 10/26/2016. Transcript due 11/25/2016. Appellant Donald J. Taylor opening brief due 01/04/2017. Appellee Commissioner of Internal Revenue answering brief due 02/06/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10137195] (RT) [Entered: 09/26/2016 02:43 PM]
Related: [-]