Original Case: 4:14-cv-00264

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-01518
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2016
Terminated:Jun 13, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 14, 2017 3:28 AM CDT
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Student Press Law Center
Represented By
Eugene Volokh
UCLA SCHOOL OF LAW
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Ratio Christi
Represented By
M. Casey Mattox
ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Students for Life of America
Represented By
M. Casey Mattox
ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Christian Legal Society
Represented By
M. Casey Mattox
ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Young America's Foundation
Represented By
M. Casey Mattox
ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Young Americans for Liberty
Represented By
M. Casey Mattox
ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Steven Leath
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Thompson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
George A. Carroll
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Tyler Murray Smith
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Warren Madden
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Thompson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
George A. Carroll
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Tyler Murray Smith
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Thomas Hill
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Thompson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
George A. Carroll
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Tyler Murray Smith
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Leesha Zimmerman
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Thompson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
George A. Carroll
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Tyler Murray Smith
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Paul Gerlich
Represented By
Michael Giudicessi
FAEGRE & BAKER
contact info
Ronald G. London
O'CONNOR & HANNAN
contact info
Lisa Beth Zycherman
DAVIS & WRIGHT
contact info
Robert Corn-Revere
contact info
Ronald London
DAVIS & WRIGHT
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Erin Furleigh
Represented By
Michael Giudicessi
FAEGRE & BAKER
contact info
Ronald G. London
O'CONNOR & HANNAN
contact info
Lisa Beth Zycherman
DAVIS & WRIGHT
contact info
Robert Corn-Revere
contact info
Ronald London
DAVIS & WRIGHT
contact info

GPO Jun 13 2017
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: James B. Loken, Diana E. Murphy and Jane Kelly
AUTHORING JUDGE:Diana E. Murphy (PUBLISHED),
CONCUR BY: Jane Kelly,
DISSENT BY: James B. Loken [4546503] [16-1518]

Docket last updated: 06/14/2017 3:28 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
Civil case docketed. [4372550] 16-1518 (LAB)
Related: [-]
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 1/22/2016, Judgment dated 1/25/2016, NOA dated 2/4/2016, Order dated 2/17/2016, Amended NOA dated 2/17/2016, Order dated 2/26/2016. [4372577] 16-1518 (LAB)
Related: [-]
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
BRIEF OF APPELLANT Thomas Hill, Steven Leath, Warren Madden and Leesha Zimmerman due 04/11/2016.. Appendix due on 04/11/2016
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4372591] 16-1518 (LAB)
Related: [-]