Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:James E Gritzner
Referred: Helen C Adams
Case #: 4:14-cv-00264
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2014
Re-opened:Feb 05, 2016
Terminated:Mar 21, 2018
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 2:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Thomas Hill
Represented By
Tyler Murray Smith
Attorney General Of Iowa
contact info
Defendant
Steven Leath
Represented By
Tyler Murray Smith
Attorney General Of Iowa
contact info
Defendant
Warren Madden
Represented By
Tyler Murray Smith
Attorney General Of Iowa
contact info
Defendant
Leesha Zimmerman
Represented By
Tyler Murray Smith
Attorney General Of Iowa
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Furleigh
Represented By
Robert Corn-Revere
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (d.C.)
contact info
Lisa B. Zycherman
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (d.C.)
contact info
Michael A Giudicessi
Faegre Baker Daniels, Llp (ia)
contact info
Ronald G. London
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (d.C.)
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Gerlich
Represented By
Robert Corn-Revere
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (d.C.)
contact info
Lisa B. Zycherman
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (d.C.)
contact info
Michael A Giudicessi
Faegre Baker Daniels, Llp (ia)
contact info
Ronald G. London
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (d.C.)
contact info

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
95 95 order Judgment Wed 03/21 12:30 PM
JUDGMENT for attorney fees and costs in favor of Erin Furleigh, Paul Gerlich against Steven Leath, Thomas Hill, Warren Madden. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 3/21/2018. (krn)
Related: [-]
94 94 order Attorney Fees Wed 03/21 11:41 AM
ORDER on Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs88 . The Court confirms and preserves its prior Orders and Judgments (ECF Nos. 60 and 87). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Judgment in favor of the Plaintiffs and against the Defendants for fees and costs in the total amount of $598,208.17, made payable to the firm of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP. See order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 3/21/2018. (nlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
93 93 misc Stipulation Tue 03/20 3:49 PM
STIPULATION on Attorney Fees and Costs and Joint Requests for Approval of Attorney Fee and Costs Award and Entry of Judgment for Plaintiffs by Erin Furleigh, Paul Gerlich. (Giudicessi, Michael)
Related: [-]