Slap Shot Holdings, Corp.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-10528 |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Slap Shot Holdings, Corp.
1050 W Hampden Ave
Englewood, CO 80110-2118 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 03/24 8:55 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM) |
||
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order Dismissing the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 3/23/2021 (LAM) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Slap Shot Holdings, Corp.. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Slap Shot Holdings, Corp.. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only. An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Sports Authority Holdings, Inc., Slap Shot Holdings, Corp., The Sports Authority, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Gift Card, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., and TSA Caribe, Inc. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Sports Authority Holdings, Inc., Case No. 16-10527 MFW) should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 3/3/2016 (LCN) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/02 10:21 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-10528 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7919473, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Case Reassigned
Wed 03/02 8:33 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (BA) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Slap Shot Holdings, Corp.. (Nestor, Michael) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Wed 03/02 8:08 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA) |