Joint Admin
|
1:16-bk-10528 - Slap Shot Holdings, Corp.
|
03/02/2016
|
Joint Admin
|
1:16-bk-10529 - TSAWD, Inc.
|
03/02/2016
|
Joint Admin
|
1:16-bk-10530 - TSA Stores, Inc.
|
03/02/2016
|
Joint Admin
|
1:16-bk-10531 - TSA Gift Card, Inc.
|
03/02/2016
|
Joint Admin
|
1:16-bk-10532 - TSA Ponce, Inc.,
|
03/02/2016
|
Joint Admin
|
1:16-bk-10533 - TSA Caribe, Inc.
|
03/02/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50213 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Slendertone Distribution, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50214 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. 2 Elevens, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50215 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. clearview systems inc. d/b/a rip-it sporting goods
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50216 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Sock and Accessory Brands Global, L.L.C.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50217 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Accu-Net, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50218 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. colorado trading & clothing co.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50219 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Spirit Leatherworks LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50220 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Aksels Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50221 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. cros, inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50222 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Sport Wrapz, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50223 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Allen Company
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50224 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. demon international, l.c. d/b/a demon united
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50225 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. delorme
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50226 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Sport Write, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50227 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Altus Athletic Manufacturing Co.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50228 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. dennco, inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50229 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Sportline, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50230 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Altus Brands, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50231 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. do-all outdoors, llc
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50232 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Sports Licensed Division of the Adidas Group, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50233 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. American Taitrade Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50234 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. dynamic brands, llc d/b/a bag boy
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50235 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Spot LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50236 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Baden Sports, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50237 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. e. mishan & sons, inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50238 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Style Eyes, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50239 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Baker Hosiery, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50240 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Supreme International, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50241 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Balanced Tech Corp.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50242 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. eco product group llc
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50243 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Tabata U.S.A., Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50244 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Barska Optics
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50245 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. emc sports, inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50246 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. eyeking, llc
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50247 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Bite Tech, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50248 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Tahsin Industrial Corp., USA d/b/a Red Ledge
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50249 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. first texas products corporation a/k/a first texas
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50250 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Boost Oxygen, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50251 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. TASER International, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50252 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. fitness iq, llc
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50253 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Boyt Harness Company, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50254 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Team Effort, Incorporated
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50255 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. flex-power, inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50256 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Brain-Pad Incorporated
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50257 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Bravo Sports
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50258 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. frogger, llc
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50259 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. The Cayre Group, Ltd.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50260 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. genfoot america inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50261 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. C&E Sports, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50262 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. California Innovations, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50263 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. g-iii leather fashions, inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50264 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Tasc Performance, Inc. f/k/a Thriv NP, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50265 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Casio America, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50266 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. goal zero llc a/k/a goal0 llc
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50267 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Top of the World, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50268 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Gonzales Enterprises, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50269 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Good Sportsman Marketing, L.L.C.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50270 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Harrow Sports, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50271 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Top of the World, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50272 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Mattingly Hitting Products, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50273 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Hickory Brands, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50274 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Tristar Products, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50275 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50276 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc. d/b/a Maxx Sung
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50277 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Impact International Products, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50278 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. T-Shirt International, Inc. d/b/a TSI Sportswear
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50279 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Mitac Digital Corp.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50280 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Joola North America, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50281 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Kai U.S.A., Ltd.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50282 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. TYR Sport, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50283 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Native Eyewear Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50284 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Unique Sports Products Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50285 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. North Bay Apparel, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50286 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Kee Action Sports LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50287 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Upperkut, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50288 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Klone Lab, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50289 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Ontel Products Corporation
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50290 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Urban Group Exercise Consultants Ltd.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50291 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Lipzipz, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50292 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Optima Life Japan, Inc. d/b/a Phiten USA, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50293 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Vapur, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50294 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Malibu Dreamgirl, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50295 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. VLC Distribution Company, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50296 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Oregon Scientific, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50297 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. 180s, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50298 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Warnaco Swimwear Products, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50299 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Passport Brands, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50300 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Wellco Enterprises, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50301 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Allstar Products Group, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50302 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Pivotal 5, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50303 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Wells Creek Outfitters, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50304 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Boccieri Golf, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50305 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Poleish Sports LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50306 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Wigman Mills, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50307 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Boxercraft Incorporated
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50308 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Wildcat Retro Brands, LLC d/b/a Original Retro Bra
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50309 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Power Balance Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50310 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Wreckless Apparel Group Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50311 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Xenith, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50312 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. H2 Golf LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50313 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Pro Performance Sports, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50314 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. XS Commerce LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50315 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. H2Old, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50316 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Productive Fitness Publishing Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50317 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Hot Chillys, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50318 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Hi-Tec Sports USA, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50319 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Professional Golfball Services Ltd. d/b/a PG Profe
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50320 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Colosseum Athletics Corporation
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50321 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. DECA International Corp. d/b/a Golfbuddy
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50322 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Trends International, LLC d/b/a Costacos Sports
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50323 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. ES Water Sports, LLC f/k/a Ally Sporting Goods LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50324 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Fan Favorite Inc. d/b/a The Boston Sports Apparel
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50325 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Umarex USA Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50326 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. FGX International Inc. d/b/a Quantum Optics Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50327 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. G2 Fit LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50328 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Golden Viking Sports LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50329 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Quisenberry Enterprises, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50330 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Rapstix LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50331 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Ricoh Imaging Americas Corp. f/k/a Pentax Imaging
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50332 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. RUAG Ammotec USA, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50333 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Seina International, LLC f/k/a Northpole US, LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50334 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Gordini USA Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50335 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Nathan Sports, Inc. a/k/a Penguin Brands Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50336 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. J.J.'S Mae, Inc. d/b/a Rainbeau
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50337 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Nikwax North America Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50338 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Jade Swimwear, LP
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50339 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Agron, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50340 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Rip Curl, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50341 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Bracketron, Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50342 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Sports Images, Inc. a/k/a SP Images Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50343 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Caravan Canopy International Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50344 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Stack-On Products Company
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50345 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Manzella Productions, Inc. a/k/a Totes Isotoner Co
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50346 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. W Sternoff LLC
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50347 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. KL Industries, Inc. a/k/a Ameriform Acquisition Co
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50348 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. M. Hidary & Co., Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50349 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Ascent Solar Technologies Inc.
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50350 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Asics America Corporation
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50351 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Tesh Sports
|
03/15/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50352 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Thorlo Inc. a/k/a Thor-Lo, Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50353 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. U.S. Divers a/k/a Aqua-Lung America, Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50354 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Wilson Sporting Goods, Inc. a/k/a Hillerich & Brad
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50355 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Zephyr Graf-X a/k/a Zephyr Grafix, Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50356 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Castlewood Apparel Corp.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50357 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Easton Baseball / Softball Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50358 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Midland Radio Corp.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50359 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Filmar USA Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50360 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Pinnacle Sports Equipment Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50361 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Icy-Hot Hydration LLC
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50362 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Soft Air USA Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50363 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Implus Footcare, LLC
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50364 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. M J Soffe a/k/a M.J. Soffe, LLC
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50365 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. O2Cool, LLC
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50366 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Shock Doctor Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50367 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. OGIO International
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50368 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Sport Dimension Inc. a/k/a Body Glove
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50369 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. SGS Sports Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50370 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Mission Products Holdings Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50371 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. GI Sportz Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50372 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Lifeline First Aid LLC
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-50373 - TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. ILNA Inc.
|
03/16/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-51014 - O2Cool, LLC v. TSA STORES, INC. et al
|
06/21/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:16-ap-51490 - Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor v. Fan Favorite Inc.
|
09/14/2016
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50006 - TSA Stores, Inc. v. Simon MacGibbon
|
01/17/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50007 - TSA Stores, Inc. v. Jeff Schumacher
|
01/17/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50011 - TSA Stores, Inc. v. Hanesbrands Inc.
|
01/23/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-50012 - TSA Stores, Inc. v. WYNIT Distribution, LLC
|
01/23/2017
|