Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10527

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:16-bk-10530
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2016
Terminated:Mar 24, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 W Hampden Ave
Englewood, CO 80110-2118
Represented By
Michael R. Nestor
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 03/24 8:53 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
25 25 4 pgs order Order Wed 03/24 8:50 AM
Order Dismissing the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 3/23/2021 (LAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
24 24 claims Transfer/Assignment of Claim Wed 12/12 9:21 AM
Transfer/Assignment of Claim.Receipt Number 91027 Fee Amount $25 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: GSMS 2005-GGR Moreno Drive Limited Partnership To Wells Fargo Bank N.A. as Trustee. Filed by GSMS 2005-GG4 Moreno Drive LP. (LAM)
Related: [-]
23 23 claims Transfer/Assignment of Claim Wed 12/12 9:13 AM
Transfer/Assignment of Claim.Receipt Number 91027 Fee Amount $25 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: U.S. Bank National Association To MSCI 2006-IQII East Merritt Square, LLC. Filed by MSCI 2006-IQII East Merritt Square, LLC. (LAM)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 07, 2018
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/08 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/07/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Friday, October 05, 2018
21 21 court VAN-441 Notice of Filing Fee(s) Due Fri 10/05 10:42 AM
Notice of Filing Fee(s) Due From Matthew I. Kramer. Filing Fee Due by 10/12/2018. Related [+] (LMD)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 claims Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 10/05 10:30 AM
Transfer/Assignment of Claim. Fee Amount $25 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: HQ8-10410-10450 Melody Lane LLC To U.S. Bank National Association. Filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (LMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
19 19 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 08/14 12:20 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Crea/PPC Long Beach Towne Center Po, L.L.C.. (LAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Service
Thursday, August 02, 2018
18 18 notice Address Change - Notice Thu 08/02 10:34 AM
Notice of Address Change Filed by Pierce County. (LAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
17 17 notice Service - Notice Fri 03/17 9:50 AM
Request for Special Notice. Filed by City and County of San Francisco. (SJS) Modified on 3/17/2017 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
16 16 claims Transfer/Assignment of Claim Wed 03/01 8:37 AM
Transfer/Assignment of Claim.Receipt Number 88913 Fee Amount $25 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Pivotal 5, LLC To RLJ Credit Opportunity Fund I, LP. Filed by RLJ Credit Opportunity Fund I, LP. (LAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2016
15 15 misc Request for Service of Notices Thu 08/25 8:27 AM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by Placer County Tax Collector . (LAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
14 14 misc Request for Service of Notices Thu 05/12 11:07 AM
Request for Service of Notices (filed as notice of appearance) Filed by Marie-Josee Dube, IBM Corporation. (LAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
13 13 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 04/22 4:23 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 04/22 4:22 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 19, 2016
11 11 claims Request for Service of Notices Sat 03/19 9:02 PM
Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Synchrony Bank. (Singh, Ramesh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2016
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/14 3:57 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by MEPT Woburn Mall, LLC (as successor in interest to Koffler/GID Woburn, LLC). (Hanlon, William)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 notice Appearance - Notice Mon 03/14 3:49 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by MEPT Woburn Mall, LLC (as successor in interest to Koffler/GID Woburn, LLC). (Hanlon, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
8 8 notice Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice Thu 03/10 11:51 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Filed by Bexar County. (Stecker, Don)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2016
7 7 notice Appearance - Notice Wed 03/09 11:57 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Bexar County. (Stecker, Don)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2016
6 6 order Order-Joint Admin Thu 03/03 12:48 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only. An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Sports Authority Holdings, Inc., Slap Shot Holdings, Corp., The Sports Authority, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Gift Card, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., and TSA Caribe, Inc. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Sports Authority Holdings, Inc., Case No. 16-10527 MFW) should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 3/3/2016 (LCN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice Thu 03/03 12:32 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Filed by DeRito Talking Stick South, LLC, successor to De Rito Pavilions 140, L.L.C.. (NACH, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
4 4 notice Appearance - Notice Wed 03/02 3:38 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by DeRito Talking Stick South, LLC, successor to De Rito Pavilions 140, L.L.C.. (NACH, ADAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 03/02 10:21 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-10530 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7919473, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Case Reassigned Wed 03/02 8:33 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 03/02 5:47 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Nestor, Michael)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 03/02 8:08 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA)
Related: [-]