Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10527

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:16-bk-10531
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2016
Terminated:Mar 24, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TSA Gift Card, Inc.
1050 W Hampden Ave
Englewood, CO 80110-2118
Represented By
Michael R. Nestor
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 03/24 8:52 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
7 7 4 pgs order Order Wed 03/24 8:50 AM
Order Dismissing the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 3/23/2021 (LAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 04/22 4:26 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by TSA Gift Card, Inc.. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 04/22 4:26 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by TSA Gift Card, Inc.. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2016
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Thu 03/03 12:48 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only. An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Sports Authority Holdings, Inc., Slap Shot Holdings, Corp., The Sports Authority, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Gift Card, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., and TSA Caribe, Inc. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Sports Authority Holdings, Inc., Case No. 16-10527 MFW) should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 3/3/2016 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 03/02 10:21 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-10531 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7919473, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Case Reassigned Wed 03/02 8:33 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 03/02 5:49 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by TSA Gift Card, Inc.. (Nestor, Michael)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 03/02 8:08 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA)
Related: [-]