Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-12894

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph G Rosania Jr
Case #: 1:16-ap-01081
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2016
Terminated:Feb 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services
Represented By
Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Smiley, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Lindquist & Vennum LLP 600 17th Street, Suite 1800S
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Theodore J. Hartl
contact info
Stephanie Kanan
contact info
Ethan Birnberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, February 17, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/17 9:58 AM
Adversary Case Number 16-1081 Closed. (rp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 01/12 7:24 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 16-1081 JGR. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 2/12/2017. (rp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/11 10:34 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order to Show Cause
26 26 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Trial) Wed 01/11 3:58 PM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Ethan Birnberg on behalf of John C. Smiley, as Chapter 7 Trustee, Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services Related [+]. (Birnberg, Ethan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, January 06, 2017
25 25 order Show Cause Mon 01/09 10:02 AM
Order to Show Cause Related [+]. Show Cause Response due date 1/20/2017 for1 , (rp) Modified text on 1/9/2017 (rp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, December 23, 2016
24 24 notice Notice to Substitute Attorney Fri 12/23 11:11 AM
Notice to Substitute Attorney. Mike S. Richardson Added to Case. Stephanie A. Kanan Terminated From Case. Filed by Michael S. Richardson on behalf of John C. Smiley, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Richardson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/09 10:35 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Generic Order
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
22 22 order Order (Generic) Wed 12/07 1:58 PM
Copy of Order from Case 14-12894 Granting Trustee's Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement (Toyota Motor Credit Corporation d/b/a Toyota Financial Services) Related [+].(rp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 21, 2016
21 21 court Receipt of Filing Fee Mon 11/21 6:20 PM
Receipt of Adversary Proceeding Filing Fee - $350.00 by EC. Receipt Number 295945. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2016
20 20 misc Status Report Mon 11/14 2:29 PM
Status Report Filed by Ethan Birnberg on behalf of John C. Smiley, as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Birnberg, Ethan)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Sunday, September 25, 2016
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/25 10:32 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/25/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Friday, September 23, 2016
18 18 order Abeyance Fri 09/23 10:58 AM
Order Granting Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Related [+]. Document due by 11/23/2016 for17 , (rp)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
17 17 motion Abeyance Fri 09/23 8:14 AM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Ethan Birnberg on behalf of John C. Smiley, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Birnberg, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Sunday, May 29, 2016
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/29 10:34 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/29/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 7016 Scheduling Order
Friday, May 27, 2016
15 15 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Fri 05/27 11:46 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF TRIAL RELATED DEADLINES PURSUANT TO FED.R.BANKR.P. 7016 (FED.R.CIV.P. 16(b)) Related [+]. Discovery due by 12/12/2016 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 12/30/2016 for1 , Pre-Trial Statement due by 2/13/2017 for1 , Pre-Trial Conference to be held on 2/21/2017 at 11:00 AM Courtroom D for1 , . (rp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 26, 2016
14 14 misc 7026 (f) Report Thu 05/26 12:24 PM
Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Ethan Birnberg on behalf of John C. Smiley, as Chapter 7 Trustee, Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services Related [+]. (Birnberg, Ethan)
Related: [-] 11 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Thursday, April 28, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/28 10:35 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/28 10:35 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
11 11 order Compliance With Rules Tue 04/26 3:40 PM
Amended Order for Compliance with FED.R.BANKR.P. 7026(Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) and (f)) Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 5/27/2016 for1 , (rp) Modified title of document on 4/26/2016 (rp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
10 10 order Compliance With Rules Tue 04/26 3:15 PM
Order for Compliance with FED.R.BANKR.P. 7026(Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a) and (f)) Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 5/27/2016 for1 , (rp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, April 21, 2016
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/21 1:51 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Nicholas H. Santarelli on behalf of Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services Related [+]. (Santarelli, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, April 09, 2016
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/09 10:37 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/09/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thursday, April 07, 2016
7 7 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 04/07 11:31 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services Answer Due 4/21/2016 Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
6 6 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Wed 04/06 5:06 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Nicholas H. Santarelli on behalf of Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services Related [+]. (Santarelli, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
5 5 misc Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Wed 04/06 5:03 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Filed by Nicholas H. Santarelli on behalf of Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services. (Santarelli, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 03/08 3:34 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services on 3/8/16 Filed by Ethan Birnberg on behalf of John C. Smiley, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Birnberg, Ethan)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 03/08 3:24 PM
Summons Issued on Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services Answer Due 04/7/2016. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Birnberg, Ethan)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Tue 03/08 9:08 AM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/08 9:08 AM
Adversary case 16-01081 Complaint by John C. Smiley, as Chapter 7 Trustee against Toyota Motor Credit Corporation, d/b/a Toyota Financial Services. Fee to be Deferred.. Adversary Status Deadline 07/6/2016 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Birnberg, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
notice Request for Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Tue 03/08 9:08 AM
This adversary Proceeding has been commenced by the trustee or debtor-in-possession. Pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule promulgated by the Judicial Conference of the United States pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1930(b), payment of the filing fee for commencing a proceeding by the trustee or debtor-in-possession is payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. Until such time as there are sufficient funds available from the estate to pay this filing fee, the trustee or debtor-in-possession hereby requests that the filing fee be deferred. Filed by Ethan Birnberg on behalf of John C. Smiley, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Birnberg, Ethan)
Related: [-]