Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joseph G Rosania
Case #: 1:14-bk-12894
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2014
Converted:Apr 04, 2014
Terminated:Apr 28, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
American Title Services Company
1350 17th St Ste 206
Denver, CO 80202-1525
Represented By
Steven R. Rider
Block Markus Williams
contact info
Matthew T. Faga
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John Smiley
600 17th Street Suite 1800 South
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Stephanie Kanan
contact info
John C. Smiley
contact info
Jared C. Walters
contact info
Ethan Birnberg
contact info
Theodore J. Hartl
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
999 18th St. Ste. 1551
Denver, CO 80202
Represented By
Joanne C. Speirs
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, 11
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294
Represented By
Joanne C. Speirs
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/13/2014 1:09 PM MDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2014
1 1 4 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Total Number of Creditors Uploaded: 27. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/10/2014. Disclosure Statement due by 07/10/2014. (Rider, Steven) Modified on 3/13/2014 (saa). Added Alias Modified on 3/13/2014 (sd). Corrected Debtor's name per PDF and EQ request.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Resolutions to Voluntary Petition
2 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition- Chapter 11 14-12894 [misc,volp11a] (1213.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19979953. Fee amount 1213.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Filed by Steven R. Rider on behalf of American Title Services Company. (Rider, Steven) Modified on 3/13/2014 (saa). Corrected Debtor name
Related: [-]
4 4 List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed by Steven R. Rider on behalf of American Title Services Company. (Rider, Steven) Modified on 3/13/2014 (saa). Corrected Debtor name
Related: [-]
5 5 List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Steven R. Rider on behalf of American Title Services Company. (Rider, Steven) Modified on 3/13/2014 (saa). Corrected Debtor name
Related: [-]
6 6 Disclosure Regarding Receivers Filed by Steven R. Rider on behalf of American Title Services Company Related [+]. (Rider, Steven) Modified on 3/13/2014 (saa). Corrected Debtor name
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition- Chapter 11
7 7 Disclosure of Compensation In the Amount of $ Firms Hourly Rates (see Application to Employ) Filed by Steven R. Rider on behalf of American Title Services Company. (Rider, Steven) Modified on 3/13/2014 (saa). Corrected Debtor name
Related: [-]