Original Case: 1:08-cv-06978

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-00661
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2016
Terminated:Apr 15, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 19, 2016 7:07 AM EDT
Amicus Curiae
United States of America
Represented By
Jeannette Anne Vargas
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New
contact info
Benjamin H. Torrance
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New
contact info
Defendant
Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social
Defendant
Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilacions Y Pensiones
Defendant
Consolidar AFJP S.A.
Defendant
Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.
Defendant
Futura AFJP S.A.
Defendant
Maxima AFJP S.A.
Defendant
Met AFJP S.A.
Defendant
Origenes AFJP S.A.
Defendant
Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A.
Defendant
Unidos S.A. AFJP
Defendant - Appellee
The Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Michael A. Paskin
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Movant
EM Ltd.
Represented By
Michael B. Mukasey
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Movant
Wilton Capital
Represented By
Neil Lieberman
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Vincent Levy
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Richard J. Holwell
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Michael Shuster
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Movant
Cordoba Capital
Represented By
Neil Lieberman
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Vincent Levy
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Richard J. Holwell
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Michael Shuster
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Movant
Montreux Partners, L.P.
Represented By
Neil Lieberman
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Vincent Levy
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Richard J. Holwell
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Michael Shuster
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Plaintiff Class Intervenors
Plaintiff - Appellant
NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By
Robert A. Cohen
Dechert LLP
contact info
Third-Party-Defendant
BBVA Securities Inc.
Third-Party-Defendant
BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc.
Third-Party-Defendant
Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.


Docket last updated: 04/19/2016 6:55 AM EDT
Friday, March 04, 2016
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant NML Capital, Ltd., FILED. [1720393] [16-661] [Entered: 03/07/2016 11:37 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/02/2016, RECEIVED.[1720402] [16-661] [Entered: 03/07/2016 11:40 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant NML Capital, Ltd., district court receipt # 020812027691, FILED.[1720409] [16-661] [Entered: 03/07/2016 11:41 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1720411] [16-661] [Entered: 03/07/2016 11:42 AM]
Related: [-]