New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:08-cv-06978
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2008
Terminated:Apr 25, 2016
Last checked: Monday Oct 24, 2016 12:05 PM EDT
Amicus
The Clearing House Association L.L.C.
Represented By
Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Amicus
Emerging Markets Creditors Association
Amicus
Duane Morris Individual Plaintiffs
Duane Morrs LLP 1540 Broadway
New York, NY 10036
Appellant
Administracion Nacional de Seguridad Social
Represented By
Lauren Emily Aguiar
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom Llp (nyc)
contact info
Appellant
Union de Administradoras de Fondos De Jubilaciones Y Pensiones
Represented By
Oliver J. Armas
Chadbourne & Parke Llp (ny)
contact info
Appellant
Unidos S.A. AFJP
Represented By
Robert Edward Grossman
Chadbourne & Parke LLP
contact info
Appellant
Profesion+Auge AFJP S.A.
Represented By
Robert Edward Grossman
Chadbourne & Parke LLP
contact info
Appellant
Origenes AFJP S.A.
Represented By
Robert Edward Grossman
Chadbourne & Parke LLP
contact info
Appellant
Met AFJP S.A.
Represented By
Robert Edward Grossman
Chadbourne & Parke LLP
contact info
Appellant
Maxima AFJP S.A.
Represented By
Robert Edward Grossman
Chadbourne & Parke LLP
contact info
Appellant
Futura AFJP S.A.
Represented By
Robert Edward Grossman
Chadbourne & Parke LLP
contact info
Appellant
Consolidar AFJP S.A.
Represented By
Robert Edward Grossman
Chadbourne & Parke LLP
contact info
Appellant
Arauca Bit AFJP S.A.
Represented By
Robert Edward Grossman
Chadbourne & Parke LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Daniel Slifkin
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Jonathan I. Blackman
Cleary Gottlieb
contact info
David Aaron Herman
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Michael A Paskin
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Cleary Gottlieb
contact info
Damaris Hernandez
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
contact info
Christopher P. Moore
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Garnishee
Banco De La Nacion Argentina
Represented By
Mark Stephen Sullivan
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Aurelius Capital Partners, LP
Represented By
Barry Robert Ostrager
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett Llp (ny)
contact info
Interested Party
GMO Emerging Country Debt Fund
Interested Party
Banco Central de la Republica Argentina
Represented By
Joseph Emanuel Neuhaus
Sullivan And Cromwell, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Interested Party
GMO Emerging Country Debt Investment Fund PLC
Interested Party
GMO Emerging Country Debt LP
Interested Party
Honero Fund I, LLC
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By
Gregory Phillip Feit
Levi Lubarsky Feigenbaum & Weiss LLP
contact info
Interested Party
JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By
Gregory Phillip Feit
Levi Lubarsky Feigenbaum & Weiss LLP
contact info
Interested Party
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Alan Howard Scheiner
contact info
Gregory Phillip Feit
Levi Lubarsky Feigenbaum & Weiss LLP
contact info
Andrea Likwornik Weiss
Levi Lubarsky Feigenbaum & Weiss LLP
contact info
Howard B. Levi
Levi Lubarsky Feigenbaum & Weiss LLP
contact info
Interested Party
MCHA Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Aurelius Capital Master, Ltd.
Represented By
Barry Robert Ostrager
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett Llp (ny)
contact info
Interested Party
Arag-V Limited
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Procella Holdings, L.P.
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Arag-T Limited
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Red Pines LLC
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Spinnaker Global Emerging Markets Fund, Ltd.
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP 101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178
Represented By
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Spinnaker Global Special Situations Fund LP
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP 101 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10178
Represented By
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Arag-O Limited
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Trinity Investments Limited
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Arag-A Limited
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Yellow Crane Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By
Timothy Barrett DeSieno
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp (nyc)
contact info
Peter Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Exchange Bondholder Group
Represented By
David A. Barrett
Boies, Schiller & Flexner, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Steven Ian Froot
Boies, Schiller & Flexner, Llp(nyc)
contact info
Sean F. O'Shea
O'Shea Partners, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Bank for International Settlements
Represented By
Karen E Wagner
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
James Loran Kerr
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Jennifer Gillian Newstead
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Edward David Sherwin
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Interested Party
Barclays Bank PLC
Interested Party
Blue Angel Capital I LLC
Represented By
Barry Robert Ostrager
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett Llp (ny)
contact info
Interested Party
Jaime Caruana
Represented By
Karen E Wagner
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
James Loran Kerr
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Jennifer Gillian Newstead
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Edward David Sherwin
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Interested Party
Cede & Co.
Represented By
Eric P Heichel
Eiseman, Levine, Lehrhaupt & Kakoyiannis, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
CitiGroup Inc.
Represented By
Karen E Wagner
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Interested Party
Citibank, N.A.
Represented By
Karen E Wagner
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
James Loran Kerr
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Craig Thomas Cagney
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Lindsey Taylor Knapp
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Matthew Brennan Rowland
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Denis J. McInerney
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Michael S. Flynn
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Citicorp North America Inc.
Represented By
Karen E Wagner
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Interested Party
Citicorp USA Inc.
Represented By
Karen E Wagner
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Interested Party
Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By
Karen E Wagner
Davis Polk & Wardwell L.L.P.
contact info
Interested Party
Clearstream Banking S.A.
Represented By
John Michael Vassos
Morgan, Lewis And Bockius Llp (ny)
contact info
Mary Christina Pennisi
Morgan Lewis & Bockius, Llp (ny)
contact info
Interested Party
Fintech Advisory Inc.
Represented By
Alexis Helene Castillo
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
William Francis Dahill
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Depository Trust Company
Represented By
Eric P Heichel
Eiseman, Levine, Lehrhaupt & Kakoyiannis, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Deutsche Bank AG New York Branch
Represented By
Philippe Alain Zimmerman
Moses & Singer LLP
contact info
Shari Ann Alexander
Moses & Singer LLP
contact info
Mark Nelson Parry
Moses & Singer LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Euro Bondholders
Represented By
Jeff G. Hammel
Latham And Watkins (ny)
contact info
Christopher J. Clark
Latham & Watkins Llp (ny)
contact info
Interested Party
EUROCLEAR BANK SA/NV
Represented By
Paul T. Shoemaker
Greenfield, Stein & Senior,llp
contact info
Angelo Michael Grasso
Greenfield, Stein & Senior,llp
contact info
Jonathan Cedarbaum
Wilmer Hale(dc)
contact info
Andrew Nathan Goldman
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Benjamin Loveland
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (bos)
contact info
Craig Goldblatt
Wilmer Hale(dc)
contact info
Interested Party
Empresa Argentina de Soluciones Satelitales ("AR-SAT")
Represented By
Kevin Michael Brennan
Lowenstein Sandler Pc (nj)
contact info
Steven Michael Hecht
Lowenstein Sandler Pc (nj)
contact info
Intervenor
Bank of America, N.A.
Intervenor Plaintiff
Plaintiff Class Intervenors
Represented By
Jennifer R. Scullion
Proskauer Rose Llp (ny)
contact info
Miscellaneous
The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By
Eric Andrew Schaffer
Reed Smith, Llp (pittsburgh)
contact info
James C. Martin
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Citigroup, Inc.
Movant
Mohammad Ladjevardian
Andersen Sleater LLC 1345 Ave. of Americas, 2nd Floor, Suite 2100
New York, NY 10105
Represented By
Jessica June Sleater
Milberg Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By
Dennis H. Hranitzky
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Eric Christopher Kirsch
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Charles I. Poret
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Charles Richard Jacob, III
Miller & Wrubel, P.C.
contact info
Jennings F. Durand
Dechert LLP
contact info
Robert A. Cohen
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Matthew Dempsey McGill
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, Llp (dc)
contact info
William Brady Mack, III
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Jason Jacob Mendro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Theodore B. Olson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jeremy Mack Sher
Miller & Wrubel, P.C.
contact info
Susan Yoshiko Shamoto
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
David Scott Hoffner
Hoffner PLLC
contact info
Kevin Samuel Reed
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By
Kenneth Andrew Caruso
White & Case Llp (ny)
contact info
Paul B Carberry
White & Case Llp (ny)
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
BBVA Securities, Inc.
Represented By
Kenneth Andrew Caruso
White & Case Llp (ny)
contact info
Paul B Carberry
White & Case Llp (ny)
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.
Represented By
Kenneth Andrew Caruso
White & Case Llp (ny)
contact info
Paul B Carberry
White & Case Llp (ny)
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
951 951 misc Sealed Document Disposed Wed 10/23 9:27 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 844 and 857 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 10/23/2024. (nmo)
Related: [-]
950 950 misc Sealed Document Disposed Wed 10/23 9:26 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 787 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 10/23/2024.(nmo)
Related: [-]
949 949 misc Sealed Document Disposed Wed 10/23 9:24 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 183 and 190 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 10/23/2024.(nmo)
Related: [-]
948 948 misc Sealed Document Disposed Wed 10/23 9:23 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 126 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 10/23/2024. (nmo)
Related: [-]
947 947 misc Sealed Document Disposed Wed 10/23 9:21 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 103, 115, 784 and 808 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 10/23/2024. (nmo)
Related: [-]