Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:16-ap-50228
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2016
Terminated:Apr 26, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
dennco, inc.
Represented By
dennco, inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Andrew L Magaziner
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Ponce, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Andrew L Magaziner
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Caribe, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Andrew L Magaziner
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
11 11 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 04/26 9:30 AM
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc. Tickle due by: 5/10/2016... Tickle due by: 5/10/2016. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/26 2:57 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50228 Closed. (NAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 5:34 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
9 9 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Wed 04/20 6:08 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference to May 25, 2016 Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 04/19 4:50 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrator and Collateral Agent, To Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. Related [+] (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3 , 3 ,2 , 3 , 3 , 3 ,2 , 3 ,2 , 3 ,2 ,2 , 3 , 3 ,2 ,2 ,2 , 3 , 3 ,2 , 3 ,2 , 3 , 3 ,2 ,2 , 3 ,2 ,2 ,2 , 3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 , 3 ,2 ,2 , 3 , 3 , 3 , 3 , 3
Friday, April 08, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 04/08 3:31 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
6 6 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 03/16 5:21 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Dennco, Inc. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/16/2016. (Nestor, Michael) Modified text on 3/17/2016 (MDW)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
5 5 misc Service List Wed 03/16 2:48 PM
Service List Notice of Service Re: 1.Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene; and 2.Opening Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene . Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 19 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Wed 03/16 10:44 AM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Related [+] Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 3 3 , 3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 , 3 ,2 ,2 ,2 , 3 ,2 ,2 ,2 , 3 , 3 ,2 , 3 , 3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 , 3 , 3
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 03/16 9:38 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50228 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7935529, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Intervene - Motion Wed 03/16 9:36 AM
Motion to Intervene Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent.. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2016
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 03/15 7:29 PM
Adversary case 16-50228 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Caribe, Inc. against dennco, inc.. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/13/2016. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A