TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Style Eyes, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-50238 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Style Eyes, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Ponce, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Caribe, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 07/12 11:15 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50238 Closed (LAM) |
||
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Mon 07/11 6:39 PM
Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Tickle due by: 7/25/2016. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 07/05 4:06 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice
Tue 07/05 3:57 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Corrected Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 07/05 12:03 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice
Tue 07/05 12:00 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 06/30 4:56 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Style Eyes, Inc. (Dougherty, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
misc
Add Attorney
Thu 06/30 4:58 PM
Attorney Evan Rassman and Shannon J. Dougherty for Style Eyes, Inc. added to case Filed by Style Eyes, Inc.. (Dougherty, Shannon) |
||
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 06/27 4:06 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Joseph Angelo Order Signed on 6/27/2016. (LMC) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 06/24 11:43 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Joseph Angelo . Receipt Number 25857, Filed by Style Eyes, Inc.. (Angelo, Joseph) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Counsel (Multi)
Fri 06/10 2:21 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 06/07 10:49 PM
Affidavit of Service of Complaint Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 06/06 2:31 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Counsel (Multi)
Wed 05/25 8:35 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 05/24 3:30 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Intervenor's Complaint
Mon 05/16 1:00 PM
Intervenor's Complaint (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 05/12 3:23 PM
Affidavit of Service Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Notice of Continued Pretrial Conferences Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice
Fri 05/06 4:32 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference and Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 04/29 12:12 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 04/27 11:53 AM
Order Granting Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene. Order Signed on 4/26/2016 (NAL) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2016 (NAL) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Fri 04/22 5:34 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice
Wed 04/20 6:17 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference to May 25, 2016 Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of No Objection
Tue 04/19 4:50 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrator and Collateral Agent, To Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Counsel (Multi)
Fri 04/08 4:00 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 03/22 4:38 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Style Eyes, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Service List
Wed 03/16 2:48 PM
Service List Notice of Service Re: 1.Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene; and 2.Opening Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene . Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
19
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Law
Wed 03/16 10:44 AM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Intervene - Motion
Wed 03/16 9:44 AM
Motion to Intervene Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent.. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/16 9:26 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50238 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7935470, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Tue 03/15 7:43 PM
Adversary case 16-50238 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Caribe, Inc. against Style Eyes, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/13/2016. (Nestor, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |