TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. frogger, llc
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-50258 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
frogger, llc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Ponce, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Caribe, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 09/26 8:57 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50258 Closed (LAM) |
||
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Regarding Joinder To The Settlement Agreement Regarding Pay-By-Scan Vendors Dated As Of 6/30/2016. Order Signed on 9/23/2016. (BJM) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding the Stipulation Regarding Joinder to the Settlement Agreement Regarding Pay-by-Scan Vendors Dated as of 6/30/16 Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Frogger, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 9/13/2016. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
25 | 25
![]() Amended Complaint to Amend Demand Amount Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as successor administrative and collateral agent (Term Loan Agent) AP Summons Served due date: 10/13/2016. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Corrected Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Affidavit of Service of Complaint Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Affidavit of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Intervenor's Complaint (Werkheiser, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Affidavit of Service Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Notice of Continued Pretrial Conferences Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference and Extension of Time to Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order Granting Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene. Order Signed on 4/26/2016. (NAL) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2016 (NAL) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference to May 25, 2016 Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of No Objection Regarding Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrator and Collateral Agent, To Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant frogger, llc. Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/16/2016. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Service List Notice of Service Re: 1.Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene; and 2.Opening Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene . Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Motion to Intervene Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent.. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 03/16 9:39 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50258 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7935529, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-50258 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Caribe, Inc. against frogger, llc. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/13/2016. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |