TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Upperkut, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-50287 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Upperkut, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Ponce, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Caribe, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order Granting Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene. Order Signed on 4/26/2016. (NAL) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2016 (NAL) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 04/27 4:13 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50287 Closed. (NAL) |
||
Tuesday, April 26, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc. Tickle due by: 5/10/2016... Tickle due by: 5/10/2016. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference to May 25, 2016 Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of No Objection Regarding Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrator and Collateral Agent, To Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Upperkut, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
none
Thu 03/17 10:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50287 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7937307, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Service List Notice of Service Re: 1.Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene; and 2.Opening Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene . Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion to Intervene Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent.. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-50287 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Caribe, Inc. against Upperkut, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/13/2016. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |