Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:16-ap-50315
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2016
Terminated:Oct 30, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
H2Old, LLC
Represented By
H2Old, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Ponce, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Caribe, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, October 30, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/30 10:00 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50315 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 15, 2017
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/16 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33
Friday, October 13, 2017
33 33 order Judgment Fri 10/13 1:52 PM
Judgment by Default Related [+] Tickle due by: 10/27/2017. Signed on 10/13/2017. (LMD)
Related: [-] 29
Friday, October 06, 2017
32 32 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Fri 10/06 4:51 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiff-Intervenor's Motion For Entry Of A Default Judgment Against Defendant Related [+] Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 29
Sunday, September 03, 2017
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/04 1:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 09/03/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30
Friday, September 01, 2017
30 30 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Fri 09/01 7:18 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant H2OLD, LLC Related [+] Signed on 9/1/2017. (LAM)
Related: [-] 28
Thursday, August 31, 2017
29 29 motion Default Judgment - Motion Thu 08/31 11:48 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Plaintiff-Intervenor's Motion For Judgment Against Defendant Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Complaint
Att: 2 Certificate of Service of Complaint - Ex B
Att: 3 Declaration - Ex C
Att: 4 Proposed Form of Order - Ex D
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
28 28 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 08/31 11:37 PM
Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Complaint
Att: 2 Certificate of Service of Complaint - Ex B
Att: 3 Declaration - Ex C
Att: 4 Proposed Form of Order - Entry of Default - Ex D
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Monday, August 29, 2016
27 27 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 08/29 12:01 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/31/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
26 26 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 07/15 6:30 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant H2Old, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 9/13/2016. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] ument25
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 07/15 10:09 AM
Amended Complaint to Amend Demand Amount Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent Related [+] AP Summons Served due date: 10/13/2016. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
24 24 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 07/05 4:06 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Tue 07/05 3:57 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Corrected Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 07/05 12:03 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Tue 07/05 12:00 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
20 20 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 06/10 2:21 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
19 19 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/07 10:52 PM
Affidavit of Service of Complaint Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2016
18 18 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 06/06 2:31 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2016
17 17 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 05/25 8:35 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2016
16 16 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 05/24 3:30 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
15 15 cmp Intervenor's Complaint Mon 05/16 10:50 AM
Intervenor's Complaint (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 05/12 3:17 PM
Affidavit of Service Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Notice of Continued Pretrial Conferences Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2016
13 13 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Fri 05/06 4:21 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference and Extension of Time to Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2016
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/29 12:12 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
11 11 order Order Wed 04/27 12:09 PM
Order Granting Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene. Order Signed on 4/26/2016. (NAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 5:34 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
9 9 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Wed 04/20 6:13 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference to May 25, 2016 Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 04/19 4:37 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrator and Collateral Agent, To Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. Related [+] (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,3 ,3 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,3 ,3 ,2 ,2
Friday, April 08, 2016
7 7 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 04/08 3:36 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2016
6 6 crditcrd none Fri 03/18 10:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50315 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7939170, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
5 5 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 03/16 4:52 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant H2Old, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/16/2016. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
4 4 misc Service List Wed 03/16 2:57 PM
Service List Notice of Service re: 1.Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene; and 2.Opening Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene . Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 19 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Wed 03/16 11:16 AM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Related [+] Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 2 2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,3 ,2
2 2 motion Intervene - Motion Wed 03/16 10:09 AM
Motion to Intervene Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent.. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2016
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 03/15 9:57 PM
Adversary case 16-50315 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Caribe, Inc. against H2Old, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/13/2016. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A