TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. Rapstix LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-50330 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Rapstix LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Ponce, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Caribe, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 09/26 7:23 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50330 Closed (LAM) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Notice of Dismissal // Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc., Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent. Tickle due by: 10/10/2017. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Corrected Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Affidavit of Service of Complaint Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Affidavit of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Intervenor's Complaint (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Affidavit of Service Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Notice of Continued Pretrial Conferences Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference and Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order Granting Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene. Order Signed on 4/26/2016. (NAL) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference to May 25, 2016 Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of No Objection Regarding Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrator and Collateral Agent, To Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Rapstix LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/20/2016. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
none
Fri 03/18 10:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50330 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7939170, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Service List Notice of Service re: 1.Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene; and 2.Opening Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene . Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion to Intervene Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent.. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-50330 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Caribe, Inc. against Rapstix LLC. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/13/2016. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |