Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:16-ap-50367
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2016
Terminated:Jul 12, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
OGIO International
Represented By
OGIO International
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Ponce, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Caribe, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/12 10:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50367 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2016
29 29 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 07/11 6:39 PM
Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Tickle due by: 7/25/2016. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
28 28 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 07/05 4:06 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Tue 07/05 3:57 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Corrected Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 07/05 12:03 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Tue 07/05 12:00 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
24 24 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 06/10 2:21 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
23 23 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/07 10:59 PM
Affidavit of Service of Complaint Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2016
22 22 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 06/06 2:31 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
21 21 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Wed 06/01 3:13 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+] Filed by SRC Liquidation, LLC (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-] 20
Friday, May 27, 2016
20 20 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 05/27 9:50 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant OGIO International, Plaintiffs TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc., Interested Partys Term Loan Agent, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent, Intervenor-Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 7/26/2016. (Alberto, Justin)
Related: [-] ument1 ,2 ,3 ,4 ,6 ,7 ,8 ,9 ,10 ,11 ,12 ,13 ,14 ,15 ,16 ,17 ,18 ,19
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, May 25, 2016
19 19 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 05/25 8:35 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2016
18 18 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 05/24 3:36 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
17 17 cmp Intervenor's Complaint Mon 05/16 11:15 AM
Intervenor's Complaint (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
16 16 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 05/12 3:23 PM
Affidavit of Service Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Notice of Continued Pretrial Conferences Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2016
15 15 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Fri 05/06 4:32 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference and Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2016
14 14 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/29 12:12 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
13 13 order Order Wed 04/27 12:18 PM
Order Granting Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene. Order Signed on 4/26/2016. (NAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 5:34 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
11 11 notice Continuation of Pretrial Conference - Notice Wed 04/20 6:17 PM
Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference to May 25, 2016 Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2016
10 10 notice Completion of Briefing - Notice Mon 04/18 8:49 PM
Notice of Completion of Briefing. Judge Walrath is reviewing this case Related [+] Filed by Term Loan Agent (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 2
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, April 11, 2016
9 9 11 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Mon 04/11 11:06 PM
Memorandum of Law Omnibus Reply In Support Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, Motion To Intervene Filed by Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2016
8 8 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 04/08 3:52 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
7 7 answer Objection Mon 04/04 3:06 PM
Objection of Ogio International, Inc. to Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Related [+] Filed by OGIO International (England, Margaret)
Related: [-] 3 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 18, 2016
6 6 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 03/18 5:09 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant OGIO International. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/17/2016. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
5 5 crditcrd none Fri 03/18 10:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50367 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7939170, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
4 4 misc Service List Wed 03/16 2:57 PM
Service List Notice of Service re: 1.Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene; and 2.Opening Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene . Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 19 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Wed 03/16 11:26 AM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Related [+] Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 2 2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,3 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,2 ,3 ,3 ,2 ,2
2 2 motion Intervene - Motion Wed 03/16 10:26 AM
Motion to Intervene Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent.. (Butz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 03/16 1:17 AM
Adversary case 16-50367 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Caribe, Inc. against OGIO International. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/14/2016. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A & B