TSA Stores, Inc. et al v. ILNA Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-50373 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ILNA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Ponce, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TSA Caribe, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) |
|
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 07/25 8:37 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50373 Closed (LAM) |
||
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Corrected Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Sports Authority Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference // Notice of Further Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Extension of Initial Pretrial Conference Date Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Affidavit of Service of Complaint Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Affidavit/Declaration of Service Filed by ILNA Inc.. (Olivere, Mark) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Affidavit of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by ILNA Inc. Mediation due date: 09/22/2016. (Olivere, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Intervenor's Complaint (Werkheiser, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Affidavit of Service Regarding Notice of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Notice of Continued Pretrial Conferences Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference and Extension of Time to Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order Granting Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene. Order Signed on 4/26/2016. (NAL) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Continuation of Pretrial Conference to May 25, 2016 Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Completion of Briefing. Judge Walrath is reviewing this case Filed by Term Loan Agent (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Memorandum of Law Omnibus Reply In Support Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, Motion To Intervene Filed by Term Loan Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Filed by TSA Caribe, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
crditcrd
none
Fri 03/18 10:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50373 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7939170, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant ILNA Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2016 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/16/2016. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Service List Notice of Service re: 1.Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene; and 2.Opening Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Omnibus Motion Of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, As Successor Administrative And Collateral Agent, To Intervene . Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion to Intervene Omnibus Motion of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Successor Administrative and Collateral Agent, to Intervene Filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in its capacity as successor Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent.. (Butz, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-50373 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., TSA Ponce, Inc., TSA Caribe, Inc. against ILNA Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/14/2016. (Neiburg, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |