Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10867

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-50385
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2016
Terminated:Aug 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shingora Textiles Ltd.
Represented By
Shingora Textiles Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, August 17, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/17 9:03 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50385 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2018
17 17 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 08/16 11:01 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Complaint Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 08/24 6:12 PM
Status Report Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Proceedings Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz, As Liquidating Trustee of the CWC Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2016
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/26 1:54 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,14
Monday, May 23, 2016
14 14 order Order Mon 05/23 2:35 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings. Related [+] Order Signed on 5/23/2016. (LCN)
Related: [-] 1664
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/23 12:08 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 05/23 11:00 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
11 11 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Fri 05/20 3:06 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, May 02, 2016
10 10 motion Approve - Motion Mon 05/02 4:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/18/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 04/22 3:25 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 10:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
7 7 order Order Tue 04/12 9:10 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 4/11/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 04/11 1:55 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Revised Form of Order with respect to Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/31 2:12 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, March 24, 2016
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/24 5:17 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Shingora Textiles Ltd.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 03/23 4:15 PM
Motion to Approve // Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/8/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 03/18 8:46 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50385 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7940486, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 03/18 8:25 PM
Adversary case 16-50385 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee against Shingora Textiles Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/16/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A