Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:14-bk-10867
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2014
Creditor Meeting:May 21, 2014
Claims Deadline:Jun 13, 2014
Terminated:Sep 27, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Sep 17, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Coldwater Creek Inc.
1 Coldwater Creek Dr
Sandpoint, ID 83864-9020
Represented By
Kenneth J. Enos
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Douglas P Bartner
Shearman & Sterling LLP
contact info
Jill Frizzley
Shearman & Sterling, LLP
contact info
William J.F. Roll, III
Shearman & Sterling LLP
contact info
Stacey Corr-Irvine
Shearman & Sterling LLP
contact info
Pauline K. Morgan
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Jaime Luton Chapman
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Debtor
CWC Liquidation Inc.
1 Coldwater Creek Dr
Sandpoint, ID 83864-9020
Represented By
Kenneth J. Enos
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Douglas P Bartner
Shearman & Sterling LLP
contact info
Jill Frizzley
Shearman & Sterling, LLP
contact info
William J.F. Roll, III
Shearman & Sterling LLP
contact info
James S. Carr
Kelley Drye & Warren
contact info
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Dana P. Kane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Stacey Corr-Irvine
Shearman & Sterling LLP
contact info
Pauline K. Morgan
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Jaime Luton Chapman
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Jun 12, 2014 1:25 PM EDT
Attorney
Flaster/Greenberg P.C.
1000 N. West Street 1200 Suite 1200
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
William J. Burnett
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Attorney
Shearman & Sterling LLP
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
Bonnie Glantz Fatell
Blank Rome LLP 1201 Market Street Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Bonnie Glantz Fatell
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Creditor
140 School Street LLC
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
168th & Dodge, LP
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
69th Leasing LLC
Represented By
Steven Z. Jurista
Wasserman, Jurista & Stolz, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Abercorn (E&A), LLC
Represented By
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Apparel Group, The
Represented By
Judy D. Thompson
Jd Thompson Law
contact info
Creditor
Arizona Public Service Company, Central Maine Power Company
Represented By
John D. Demmy, Esq
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Asian Eye, Ltd.
Zender Thurston, P.S. P.O. Box 5226
Bellingham, WA 98227
Represented By
Laughlan H. Clark
Zender Thurston, P.S.
contact info
Creditor
BBM, Inc.
2100 Manchester Road, Suite 1750
Wheaton, IL 60187
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Gilbert R. Saydah, Jr.
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
BRE Throne Preston Park LLC
Represented By
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bayshore Town Center LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bellevue Square Merchants Association
Represented By
Amy K. D'Amato
Nold Muchinsky PLLC
contact info
Michael G. Busenkell
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Brya M. Keilson
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
David A. Nold
Nold Muchinsky PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Bellevue Square, LLC
Represented By
Amy K. D'Amato
Nold Muchinsky PLLC
contact info
Michael G. Busenkell
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Brya M. Keilson
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
David A. Nold
Nold Muchinsky PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Big Blue Lake LLC
Represented By
Reed A. Heiligman
Frankgecker LLP
contact info
Creditor
Blakeney Retail, LLC managed by CNL Crosand Commercial Real Estate
Horack Talley Pharr & Lowndes 301 South College St., Suite 2600
Charlotte, NC 28202
Represented By
Kristin D. Ogburn
Horack Talley Pharr & Lowndes
contact info
Creditor
Bohannan Development Company
Represented By
Catherine Scholmann Robertson
Pahl & Gosselin
contact info
Creditor
Brixmor GA Waterford Commons LLC
Represented By
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
Represented By
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
CAPREF Eden Prairie LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
Represented By
Joseph J. McMahon, Jr.
Ciardi, Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Creditor
CLP-SPF Rookwood Commons, LLC
Represented By
Ralph E. Dill
Harris, Mcclellan, Binau & Cox P.L.L.
contact info
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
CPBP-VII Associates, L.P.
Represented By
Steven W. Kelly
Silver & Deboskey
contact info
Creditor
Cafaro Management Company dba Millcreek Mall
Represented By
Richard T. Davis
The Cafaro Company
contact info
Creditor
Capital Augusta Properties LLC
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Carlyle-Cypress Tuscaloosa I, LLC
Creditor
Carlyle/Cypress Leesburg I, LLC
Represented By
Leon Koutsouftikis
Magruder, Cook, Carmody & Koutsouftikis
contact info
Creditor
Carroll ISD, Arlington ISD
Perdue Brandon Fielder et al PO Box 13430
Arlington, TX 76094
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Casto-Oakbridge Venture, Ltd.
Represented By
Ralph E. Dill
Harris, Mcclellan, Binau & Cox P.L.L.
contact info
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
CenterCal Properties, LLC
Represented By
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Certain Texas Taxing Authorities
Represented By
Owen M. Sonik
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
City of Fairview
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
City of Frisco
Linebarger Goggan Blair &Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
City of Pearland
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Collin County Tax Assessor Collector
1255 West 15th Street Suite 805
Plano, TX 75075
Represented By
Michael S. Mitchell
Michael S. Mitchell, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Concept Creator Fashion Ltd.
Represented By
Stephen D Lerner
Squire Sanders
contact info
Elliot M. Smith
Squire Patton Boggs
contact info
Creditor
County of Loudoun, Virginia
One Harrison St., SE (MSC #06)
Leesburg, VA 20175
Represented By
Belkys Escobar
Loudoun County, Virginia
contact info
Creditor
County of San Bernardino Treasurer and Tax Collector
Represented By
Barry S Glaser
Steckbauer Weinhart Jaffe, LLP
contact info
Marc J. Phillips
Manion Gaynor & Manning LLP
contact info
Creditor
Crocker Park Delaware, LLC
Represented By
Carl N. Kunz, III
Morris James LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cypress Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
DBRA RED Woodbury, LLC/DBRA RED Woodbury Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
DDR Corp.
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Gilbert R. Saydah, Jr.
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
James S. Carr
Kelley Drye & Warren
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson,LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Deutsche Asset & Wealth Management
Represented By
Dustin P. Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Diamond Potomac Town Center LLC
Dennis D. Miller Stein & Lubin LLP 600 Montgomery Street, 14th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Dennis D. Miller
Stein & Lubin LLP
contact info
Creditor
District at Green Valley, LLC
Represented By
William Novotny
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Donahue Schriber Realty Group, L.P.
Trainor Fairbrook 980 Fulton Avenue
Sacramento, CA 95825
Represented By
Jennifer Lynn Pruski
Trainor Fairbrook
contact info
Creditor
Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, Duke Energy Florida, Inc. d/b/a Progress Energy Florida
Represented By
John D. Demmy, Esq
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Duke Energy Indiana, Inc., Duke Energy Kentucky, Inc., Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
Represented By
John D. Demmy, Esq
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Duke Energy Progress, Inc., Georgia Power Company, PECO Energy Company
Represented By
John D. Demmy, Esq
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Duquesne Light Company
Bernstein-Burkley LLC Attn: Stacey Suncine Suite 2200 Gulf Tower
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
Represented By
Jodi L. Hause
Bernstein-Burkley, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Eastchester Associates Limited Partnership
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Creditor
Easton Town Center II, LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Creditor
Easton Town Center II, LLC and Easton Gateway, LLC
Represented By
Randall D. LaTour
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Justin K. Edelson
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Creditor
El Paseo Collection Promenade, LLC
Loeb & Loeb LLP 10100 Santa Monica Blvd. Suite 2200
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Bernard R. Given, II
Loeb & Loeb
contact info
Creditor
FCC, LLC dba First Capital
3350 Riverwood Parkway, Suite 1750
Atlanta, GA 30339
Creditor
Federal Realty Investment Trust
Represented By
David L. Pollack
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Tobey M. Daluz
contact info
Matthew Summers
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
GE Capital Information Technology Solutions, Inc., fdba IKON Financial Services
Bankruptcy Administration 1738 Bass Road P.O. Box 13708
Macon, GA 31208
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Gilbert R. Saydah, Jr.
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Kristen N. Pate
General Growth Properties, Inc.
contact info
James S. Carr
Kelley Drye & Warren
contact info
Creditor
GTL Asia Limited
Represented By
William J. Burnett
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Gallatin TR, L.P.
Represented By
Mark X. Mullin
Haynes And Boone, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Gateway Woodside Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Glimcher Properties Limited Partnership
Represented By
Lindsey F. Baker
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Ronald E Gold
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Creditor
Greater Lakeside Corporation A/A/F Causeway LLC
Represented By
Fred B. Ringel
Robinson Brog Leinward Et Al.
contact info
Creditor
Greenberg Gibbons Commercial Corp.
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Greene Town Center LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Creditor
Greenway Station SPE, LLC
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Dan Griesemer
Represented By
Lawrence J. Hilton
Hewitt & O'Neil LLP
contact info
Creditor
Groupon, Inc.
Represented By
John D. Demmy, Esq
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
Geoffrey S. Goodman
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
IBM Corporation
Creditor
IBM Credit Corporation
Creditor
Inland American Retail Management LLC
Represented By
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Kern County Treasurer and Tax Collector Office
c/o Salina Thomas P.O. Box 579
Bakersfield, CA 93302
Creditor
LA Forum Peachtree I, LLC
Morris, Manning & Martin, LLP 3343 Peachtree Road, NE 1600 Atlanta Financial Center
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
David W. Cranshaw
Morris Manning & Martin LLP
contact info
Creditor
Legacy Place LLC
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Levin Management Corporation
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Gilbert R. Saydah, Jr.
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
Levis Commons, LLC
Represented By
Tim J. Robinson
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Andrew R. Remming
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Little Rock Development Company, LLC
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Maricopa County Treasurer
222 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1100
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
Lori A. Lewis
Maricopa County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Matrix Clothing Pvt. Ltd.
McCrath North Mullin & Kratz, PC, LLo 1601 Dodge Street, Suite 3700
Omaha, NE 68102
Represented By
Robert J. Bothe
Mcgrath North Mullin & Kratz, Pc Llo
contact info
Brya M. Keilson
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Michael T. Eversden
Mcgrath North Mullin & Kratz Pc Llo
contact info
Creditor
Mayfaire Retail, LLC
6835 Conservation Way
Wilmington, NC 28405
Represented By
J. Michael Fields
Ward And Smith, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
McLennan County
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Licensing, GP
Riddell Williams P.S. 1001 - 4th Avenue Suite 4500
Seattle, WA 98154
Represented By
Hilary B. Mohr
Riddell Williams P.S.
contact info
Creditor
Miller Capital Advisory, Inc.
Represented By
Louis F. Solimine
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Steven A. Ginther
Missouri Dept. Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Montgomery County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
NStar Electric & Gas Corporation, Public Service Company of New Hampshire and Westar Energy, Inc.
Represented By
John D. Demmy, Esq
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Norterra West, LLC
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Kathleen M. Miller
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Creditor
O'Connor/Realvest Milford LLC
Represented By
Joseph Grey
Cross & Simon LLC
contact info
Vincent J. Pisegna
Krokidas & Bluestein LLP
contact info
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
320 Robert S Kerr Ave Rm 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
Represented By
Gretchen A. Crawford
Oklahoma County Treasurer
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By
James E. Huggett
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter Nemer, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Orchard Brands Corporation
Represented By
Michael G. Busenkell
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
J.R. Smith
contact info
Creditor
POP AIV LLC, Hamilton Shoppes LLC and C Keys LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Wisler
Connolly Gallagher
contact info
Creditor
Premier Mandeville, LLC
Fishman Haygood 201 St. Charles Avenue 46th Floor
New Orleans, LA 70170
Represented By
Degan Skylar Rosenbloom
Fishman Haygood Phelps Walmsley Willis
contact info
Creditor
RED Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
RED Lee's Summit East, LLC
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Retail Properties of America, Inc.
Represented By
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Rouse Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Gilbert R. Saydah, Jr.
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
Route 146 Millbury LLC
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
S.R. Weiner & Associates Inc.,
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
SAP America, Inc.
Represented By
Donald K. Ludman
Brown & Connery LLP
contact info
Creditor
SAP Industries, Inc.
Attn: Donald K. Ludman, Esquire 6 N. Broad Street Suite 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096
Represented By
Donald K. Ludman
Brown & Connery LLP
contact info
Creditor
Salt River Project, San Diego Gas & Electric Company, Southern California Edison Company
Represented By
John D. Demmy, Esq
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
San Marcos CISD
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Diane W. Sanders
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Shadow Lake Town Center, LLC
Represented By
Michelle E. Shriro
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Shoppes At Bellemead
Represented By
Roger Joseph Naus
Wiener, Weiss & Madison (apc)
contact info
Creditor
Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC
19772 MacArthur Blvd. # 200
Irvine, CA 92612
Creditor
Simon Property Group Inc.
Simon Property Group Inc. 225 West Washington Street Ron Tucker
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Ronald Mark Tucker
Simon Property Group, LP
contact info
Creditor
Smith County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Southgate Mall Associates, LLP
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Spotsylvania Mall Company dba Spotsylvania Towne Centre
Represented By
Richard T. Davis
The Cafaro Company
contact info
Creditor
Spring Branch Independent School District
Represented By
Owen M. Sonik
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Stanbery Development
Represented By
David L. Pollack
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Jon Pearson
contact info
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Tobey M. Daluz
contact info
Matthew Summers
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners LLC
Represented By
Dustin P. Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By
Paul W. Carey
Mirick O'Connell Demallie & Lougee
contact info
Creditor
TA Associates Realty
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Taubman Landlords
Attn. Andrew S. Conway 200 E. Long Lake Road Suite 300
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304
Represented By
Susan E. Kaufman
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Andrew S. Conway
The Taubman Company
contact info
Creditor
Taxing Districts Collected by Randall County c/o
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott PO Box 9132
Amarillo, TX 79105
Represented By
D'Layne Carter
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder Collins And Mot
contact info
Creditor
Texas Ad Valorem Taxing Jurisdictions
Lee Gordon P O Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680
Represented By
Lee B. Gordon
Mccreary,veselka,bragg & Allen, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Represented By
Jason A. Starks
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
The Connecticut Light and Power Company, Yankee Gas Services Company
Represented By
John D. Demmy, Esq
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
The Macerich Company
2029 Century Park East, Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
The Marion Plaza, Inc. dba Eastwood Mall
Cafaro Managment Company 2445 Belmont Avenue P O Box 2186
Youngstown, OH 44504
Represented By
Richard T. Davis
The Cafaro Company
contact info
Creditor
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Dustin P. Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Town & Country Partnership
Represented By
Anne E. Catmull
Hoover Slovacek LLP
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Trademark Property Company
Represented By
Kelly M. Conlan
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767
Represented By
Kay Diebel Brock
Travis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
UBS Realty Investors LLC
Represented By
David L. Pollack
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Tobey M. Daluz
contact info
Matthew Summers
contact info
Jon T. Pearson
contact info
Creditor
UCR Asset Services
2029 Century Park East, Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Dustin Parker Branch
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.
Bialson, bergen & Schwab, a P. C. 2600 El Camino Real Suite 300
Palo Alto, CA 94306
Represented By
Kenneth Thomas Law
Bialson, Bergen & Schwab
contact info
Creditor
United HealthCare Services, Inc.
185 Asylum Street
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Eric S. Goldstein
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Creditor
W/S Brunswick Properties Limited Partnership
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
W/S Development Associates LLC
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
W/S Peak Canton Properties LLC
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
W/S/M Hingham Properties LLC
Represented By
Vanessa P. Moody
Gouslton & Storrs PC
contact info
Douglas B. Rosner
Goulston & Storrs, P.C.
contact info
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
WIL-CPT Arlington Highlands 1, LP
Represented By
Jason Binford
Kane Russell Coleman & Logan PC
contact info
Creditor
Washington State Taxing Agencies
Represented By
Zachary Mosner
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Wayside Commons Investors LLC
Represented By
Joseph Grey
Cross & Simon LLC
contact info
Vincent J. Pisegna
Krokidas & Bluestein LLP
contact info
Creditor
Westfield, LLC
Represented By
Niclas A. Ferland
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporatoin
contact info
Kevin A. Guerke
Seitz Van Ogtrop & Green, P.A.
contact info
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Creditor
Westwood Contractors, Inc.
Bruce W. Akerly Cantey Hanger LLP 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 3300
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Bruce W. Akerly
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wichita Falls City, Wichita Falls Independent School District & Wichita County
Represented By
Jeanmarie Baer
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Winter Park Town Center, Ltd.
Represented By
Ralph E. Dill
Harris, Mcclellan, Binau & Cox P.L.L.
contact info
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
Zona Rosa Development, LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
Simon E. Fraser
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Mark E. Felger
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Bruce S. Nathan
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
S. Jason Teele
Lowenstein Sandler
contact info
Norman N. Kinel
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Terence D. Watson
Lowensein Sandler LLP
contact info
Jason E. Halper
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Interested Party
575 Broadway Associates LP
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Andrew John Roth-Moore
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Interested Party
ASJ Consulting, LLC
Represented By
Howard P. Magaliff
Rich Michaelson Magaliff Moser, LLP
contact info
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Bayer Retail Company IV, LLC
Represented By
Joe Joseph
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Heather A. Lee
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
CBL & Associates Management, Inc.
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CC Holdings Agency Corporation
Represented By
Michael B. Slade
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael W. Yurkewicz
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Morton R Branzburg
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg, LLP
contact info
Melissa N. Koss
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Domenic E. Pacitti
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Joshua Sussberg
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CC Holdings of Delaware, LLC - Series A
Represented By
Michael B. Slade
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael W. Yurkewicz
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Morton R Branzburg
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg, LLP
contact info
Melissa N. Koss
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Domenic E. Pacitti
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Joshua Sussberg
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CC Holdings of Delaware, LLC - Series B
Represented By
Michael B. Slade
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Michael W. Yurkewicz
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Morton R Branzburg
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg, LLP
contact info
Melissa N. Koss
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Domenic E. Pacitti
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Joshua Sussberg
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CC Intellectual Property Limited and the Talbots, Inc., as Designee
Represented By
Seth A. Niederman
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Cafaro Management Company dba Millcreek Mall
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Cleveland Electric Illuminating Company
Represented By
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Comenity Bank
Represented By
Marisa A. Terranova
Richards Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Sarah Link Schultz
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Travis A. McRoberts
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Paul N. Heath
Richards Layton & Finger
contact info
Interested Party
FTN Co., LTD
Represented By
William J. Burnett
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
G&I VI Promenade, LLC
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
G&I VII Operating LLC
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
GB Retail, LLC
Represented By
David M. Powlen
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
Kevin G. Collins
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Patrick E. Mears
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Highland Village Limited Partnership
Represented By
Adrian S. Baer
Cordray & Schneller
contact info
Interested Party
Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC and Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC
Represented By
Marion M. Quirk
Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, PA
contact info
Nicholas J. Brannick
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info
Cindi Eilbott Giglio
Curtis Mallet-Prevost Colt & Mosle LLP
contact info
Steven J. Reisman
Curtis Mallet-Prevost Colt & Mosle LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Holyoke Mall Company, L.P.
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C. c/o Kevin M. Newman 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204
Represented By
Susan E. Kaufman
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
IMI Huntsville LLC
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
IMI Mount Pleasant LLC
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Jersey Central Power & Light Company
Represented By
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Joint Venture
Represented By
Neil M. Snyder
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
William Mark Alleman, Jr
Morris Nicholas Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Scott K. Charles
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Interested Party
Lane Avenue 450, LLC
Represented By
Edward Kosmowski
Clark Hill Thorp Reed
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill Thorp Reed
contact info
David M. Blau
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Interested Party
Legacy Village Investors LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Waxman
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Legacy Village Partners, LLC
24449 Cedar Road
Cleveland, OH 44124
Represented By
Jonathon W. Groza
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
M. Colette Gibbons
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Me Bath Spa Experience, LLC
Represented By
Howard P. Magaliff
Rich Michaelson Magaliff Moser, LLP
contact info
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Metropolitan Edison Company
Represented By
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Monongahela Power Company
Represented By
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
NP/I&G EastChase Property Owner, LLC
Represented By
Joe Joseph
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Heather A. Lee
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
NorthPark Partners, LP
8080 North Central Expwy Ste. 100
Dallas, TX 75206
Represented By
James H Billingsley
contact info
Justin K. Edelson
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Ohio Edison Company
Represented By
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
PAOG & McEwen Lifestyle Centers - Centerra, LLC
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
PFP Columbus LLC
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Pennsylvania Electric Company
Represented By
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Pennsylvania Power Company
Represented By
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Potomac Edison Company
Represented By
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ramco-Gershenson Properties, L.P.
Represented By
Edward Kosmowski
Clark Hill Thorp Reed
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill Thorp Reed
contact info
David M. Blau
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Interested Party
Rimini Street, Inc.
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Interested Party
Spotsylvania Mall Company dba Spotsylvania Towne Centre
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Tharanco Dress Group LLC d/b/a Ronni Nicole
Represented By
Cory D. Kandestin
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
dba Eastwood Mall The Marion Plaza, Inc.
2445 Belmont Avenue P.O. Box 2186
Youngstown, OH 44504
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
The Roseville Fountains, L.P.
Represented By
Greg Josephson
Steward Ward & Josephson
contact info
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
The Taubman Landlords
Represented By
Susan E. Kaufman
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Andrew S. Conway
The Taubman Company
contact info
Interested Party
Toledo Edison Company
Represented By
John M Craig
Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Town Center Plaza, LLC
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Tri-North Builders, Inc.
Represented By
Christina M. Thompson
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Interested Party
UPV Corporation
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
VORH Associates, LLC
Represented By
Edward Kosmowski
Clark Hill Thorp Reed
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill Thorp Reed
contact info
David M. Blau
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Interested Party
Webb Gin, LLC
Represented By
Joe Joseph
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Heather A. Lee
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Administrative Agent, Collateral Agent and Swing Line Lender
Represented By
Steven K. Kortanek
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP
contact info
Donald E. Rothman
Riemer & Braunstein , LLP
contact info
Jason S. DelMonico
Riemer & Braunstein LLP
contact info
Paul S. Samson
Riemer& Braunstein LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Wood County Development Authority
Represented By
Francis A. Monaco, Jr.
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice
contact info
Ryan C. Cicoski
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP
contact info
Liquidating Trustee
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Alex Govze
Ask Financial LLP
contact info
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Julia Bettina Klein
Klein LLC
contact info
Michael Savetsky
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Gary D. Underdahl
Ask Financial LLP
contact info
Kristin S. Elliott
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Kendra K Bader
Ask LLP
contact info
Kara E Casteel
Ask Financial LLP
contact info
James S. Carr
Kelley Drye & Warren
contact info
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Brigette G. McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Other Prof.
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
Other Prof.
Holland & Hart LLP
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
David L. Buchbinder
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
Benjamin A. Hackman
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
David L. Buchbinder
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
Benjamin A. Hackman
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/27 1:50 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50407 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]