Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10867

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-50386
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2016
Terminated:Nov 05, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Richa & Company
Represented By
Richa & Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, November 05, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/05 9:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50386 Closed (LH)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 21, 2018
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/22 12:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38
Friday, October 19, 2018
38 38 order Judgment Fri 10/19 9:52 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Richa & Company for Failure to Defend Action. Related [+] Signed on 10/18/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 34 ,35 ,36
Thursday, August 23, 2018
37 37 misc Status Report Thu 08/23 9:30 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Procedings Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
36 36 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 08/22 9:23 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Richa & Company for Failure to Defend Action Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 34
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
35 35 17 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Wed 03/21 4:55 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Richa & Company for Failure to Defend Action Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 1 ,33 ,34
34 34 motion Default Judgment - Motion Wed 03/21 4:54 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Richa & Company Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Objections due by 4/5/2018. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
33 33 order Withdraw As Attorney Wed 12/06 2:57 PM
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to Defendant Rich & Company. Related [+] Order Signed on 12/6/2017. (LCN)
Related: [-] 25
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
32 32 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 12/05 3:42 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to Defendant Rich & Company Related [+] Filed by Richa & Company. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 25
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, November 27, 2017
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/27 7:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
30 30 answer Response Mon 11/27 7:38 PM
Response Liquidating Trustee's Limited Response to Motion to Withdrawal as Counsel to Defendant Richa & Company Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
29 29 notice Service - Notice Wed 11/15 2:31 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Written Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions, Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Filed by Richa & Company (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
28 28 notice Hearing - Notice Tue 11/14 1:09 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to Defendant Richa & Company Related [+] Filed by Richa & Company Hearing scheduled for 1/3/2018 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/27/2017. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 25 ,26
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 13, 2017
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/13 3:01 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Richa & Company. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 25 ,26
26 26 notice Hearing - Notice Mon 11/13 3:00 PM
Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to Defendant Richa & Company Related [+] Filed by Richa & Company Hearing scheduled for 1/3/2018 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/27/2017. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] 25
25 25 motion Withdraw As Attorney - Motion Mon 11/13 10:53 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Richa & Company. Objections due by 11/27/2017. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Friday, September 29, 2017
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/29 3:20 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Under Rule 26(A)(1) Of The Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure And Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 7026 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2017
23 23 motion Stipulation Mon 08/28 3:28 PM
Stipulation Extending Deadline to Serve and Respond to Discovery Requests Between Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee and Richa & Company . Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
22 22 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Tue 08/22 3:46 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Monaco, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2016
21 21 claims|notice Request for Service of Notices|Appearance - Notice Mon 12/05 1:25 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service., Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Richa & Company. (Bothe, Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 04, 2016
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/05 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, December 02, 2016
19 19 court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 12/02 9:39 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Francis A. Monaco, Jr. is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2016. (SJS)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, December 01, 2016
18 18 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Thu 12/01 2:19 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
17 17 misc Status Report Wed 08/24 6:12 PM
Status Report Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Proceedings Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz, As Liquidating Trustee of the CWC Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/10 11:40 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Richa & Company Mediation due date: 10/11/2016. (Eversden, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2016
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/26 1:50 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,14
Monday, May 23, 2016
14 14 order Order Mon 05/23 2:35 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings. Related [+] Order Signed on 5/23/2016. (LCN)
Related: [-] 1664
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/23 12:08 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 05/23 11:00 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
11 11 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Fri 05/20 3:01 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, May 02, 2016
10 10 motion Approve - Motion Mon 05/02 4:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/18/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 04/22 3:25 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 10:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
7 7 order Order Tue 04/12 9:10 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 4/11/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 04/11 1:55 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Revised Form of Order with respect to Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/31 2:08 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, March 24, 2016
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/24 5:20 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Richa & Company. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 03/23 4:15 PM
Motion to Approve // Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/8/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 03/18 8:46 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50386 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7940486, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 03/18 8:29 PM
Adversary case 16-50386 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee against Richa & Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/16/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A