Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10867

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-50393
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2016
Terminated:May 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Creative Retail Packaging, Inc.
707 N Shepherd Dr Suite 600
Houston, TX 77007
Represented By
Creative Retail Packaging, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 05, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/05 7:59 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50393 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/04 11:46 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
18 18 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Thu 01/12 10:51 AM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Sandler, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 04, 2016
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/05 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, December 02, 2016
16 16 court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 12/02 8:55 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Bradford Sandler is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2016. (SJS)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, December 01, 2016
15 15 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Thu 12/01 2:06 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
14 14 misc Status Report Wed 08/24 6:12 PM
Status Report Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Proceedings Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz, As Liquidating Trustee of the CWC Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
13 13 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 06/22 10:09 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Brian L. Shaw, Esquire Related [+] Order Signed on 6/22/2016. (JMW)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 06/21 4:26 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Brian L. Shaw . Receipt Number 0311-19510, Filed by Creative Retail Packaging, Inc.. (Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/21 4:23 PM
Answer of Creative Retail Packaging, Inc.'s to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers and to Disallow Claims Related [+]. Filed by Creative Retail Packaging, Inc. Mediation due date: 10/19/2016.(Horan, Thomas) Modified on 6/22/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, May 17, 2016
10 10 order Order Tue 05/17 11:09 AM
[ENTERED IN ERROR] Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 5/16/2016 (SJS) Modified on 5/17/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 04/22 3:25 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 10:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
7 7 order Order Tue 04/12 8:57 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 4/11/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 04/11 1:55 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Revised Form of Order with respect to Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/31 12:46 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, March 24, 2016
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/24 5:27 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Creative Retail Packaging, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 03/23 4:15 PM
Motion to Approve // Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/8/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 03/18 9:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50393 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7940501, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 03/18 8:59 PM
Adversary case 16-50393 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee against Creative Retail Packaging, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/16/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A