Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10867

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-50394
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2016
Terminated:Apr 13, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rakuten Marketing LLC
215 Park Avenue South 9th Floor
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Rakuten Marketing LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/13 11:16 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50394 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
6 6 notice Dismissal - Notice Mon 04/11 2:21 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/31 2:07 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, March 24, 2016
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/24 5:21 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Rakuten Marketing LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 03/23 4:15 PM
Motion to Approve // Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/8/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 03/18 9:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50394 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7940501, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 03/18 9:02 PM
Adversary case 16-50394 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee against Rakuten Marketing LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/16/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A