Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10867

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-50395
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2016
Terminated:Sep 06, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gary Hong Kong Limited
Represented By
Gary Hong Kong Limited
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/06 11:30 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50395 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/24 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/24 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/22 12:37 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,14 ,15
Monday, August 21, 2017
15 15 court Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b) Mon 08/21 10:05 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Gary Hong Kong Limited Related [+]. Tickle due by: 9/5/2017. Signed on 8/21/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Mon 08/21 10:04 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Gary Hong Kong Limited Related [+]. Signed on 8/21/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, August 18, 2017
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 08/18 11:20 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 12 12
Att: 1 Exhibit A
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Fri 08/18 11:16 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
11 11 misc Exhibit Tue 09/06 10:52 PM
Exhibit(s) Stipulation Extending Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
10 10 misc Status Report Wed 08/24 6:12 PM
Status Report Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Proceedings Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz, As Liquidating Trustee of the CWC Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 04/22 3:25 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 10:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
7 7 order Order Tue 04/12 8:59 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 4/11/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 04/11 1:55 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Revised Form of Order with respect to Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/31 12:52 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, March 24, 2016
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/24 5:23 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Gary Hong Kong Limited. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 03/23 4:15 PM
Motion to Approve // Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/8/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 19, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 03/19 12:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50395 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7940727, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Sat 03/19 11:58 AM
Adversary case 16-50395 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee against Gary Hong Kong Limited. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/17/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A