Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10867

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-50396
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2016
Terminated:Aug 30, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gaschain International, S.A.
Represented By
Gaschain International, S.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/30 8:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50396 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/18 1:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
26 26 order Judgment Tue 08/15 3:08 PM
Judgment [ORDER GRANTING] for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Gaschain International, S.A. for Failure to Participate in Required Mediation Related [+] Tickle due by: 8/29/2017. Signed on 8/15/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, August 14, 2017
25 25 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Mon 08/14 9:23 PM
Certificate of No Objection and Certification of Counsel Requesting Entry of Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Gaschain International, S.A. for Failure to Participate in Required Mediaton Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 7 ,22 ,23
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, May 12, 2017
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/12 12:23 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-] 22 ,23
23 23 misc Memorandum of Law Fri 05/12 9:59 AM
Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Gaschain International, S.A. for Failure to Participate in Required Mediation Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 motion Default Judgment - Motion Fri 05/12 9:56 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Gaschain International, S.A. for Failure to Participate in Required Mediation Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, March 31, 2017
21 21 mediation Mediation Status Report Fri 03/31 2:08 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 04, 2016
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/05 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, December 02, 2016
19 19 court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 12/02 8:59 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2016. (SJS)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, December 01, 2016
18 18 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Thu 12/01 2:08 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
17 17 misc Status Report Wed 08/24 6:12 PM
Status Report Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Proceedings Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz, As Liquidating Trustee of the CWC Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/29 5:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Gaschain International, S.A. Mediation due date: 10/27/2016.(Allinson, III, Elihu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 26, 2016
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/26 1:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,14
Monday, May 23, 2016
14 14 order Order Mon 05/23 2:35 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings. Related [+] Order Signed on 5/23/2016. (LCN)
Related: [-] 1664
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/23 12:08 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 05/23 11:00 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
11 11 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Fri 05/20 2:58 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, May 02, 2016
10 10 motion Approve - Motion Mon 05/02 4:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/18/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 04/22 3:25 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 10:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
7 7 order Order Tue 04/12 8:59 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 4/11/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 04/11 1:55 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Revised Form of Order with respect to Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/31 12:54 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, March 24, 2016
4 4 2 pgs notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/24 5:11 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Gaschain International, S.A.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 03/23 4:15 PM
Motion to Approve // Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/8/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 19, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 03/19 12:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50396 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7940727, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Sat 03/19 12:02 PM
Adversary case 16-50396 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee against Gaschain International, S.A.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/17/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A