Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10867

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-50400
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2016
Terminated:Nov 05, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
GTL Asia Limited
Represented By
GTL Asia Limited
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, November 05, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/05 12:00 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50400 Closed (LH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/31 2:03 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal related document(s)1 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
31 31 misc Status Report Thu 08/23 9:30 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Procedings Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2018
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/30 4:47 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by GTL Asia Limited Mediation due date: 11/27/2018. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
29 29 order Reopen Adversary Proceeding Thu 07/26 2:51 PM
Order Reopening Adversary Proceeding, Vacating Default Judgment, Establishing Certain Litigation Deadlines. Related [+] Order Signed on 7/26/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 28
utility Reopen AP Case Thu 07/26 3:11 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
28 28 motion Reopen Adversary Proceeding - Motion Wed 07/25 3:56 PM
Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding Consensual Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding, Vacate Default Judgment, and Establish Litigation Schedule . Filed by GTL Asia Limited. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
27 27 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Wed 07/25 3:47 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Related [+] Filed by GTL Asia Limited (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 26
Friday, July 13, 2018
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/13 2:36 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by GTL Asia Limited Mediation due date: 11/13/2018. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, July 09, 2018
25 25 misc Exhibit Mon 07/09 10:41 PM
Exhibit(s) Stipulation Vacating Default Judgment and Extending Deadlines Under Scheduling Order Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 1 ,7 ,20 ,23
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/30 9:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50400 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/17 1:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/16/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23
Monday, May 14, 2018
23 23 court Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b) Mon 05/14 7:56 AM
Default Judgment Against GTL Asia Limited. Related [+] Signed on 5/14/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, May 10, 2018
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/11 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/10 11:21 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 18 ,19
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
20 20 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Tue 05/08 1:34 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant GTL Asia Limited Related [+] Signed on 5/8/2018. (LCN)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, May 07, 2018
19 19 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Mon 05/07 6:13 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 1 ,18 18 ,1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
18 18 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Mon 05/07 6:11 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
17 17 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 03/21 8:35 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 1 ,4 ,14
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 08/24 6:12 PM
Status Report Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Proceedings Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz, As Liquidating Trustee of the CWC Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2016
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/26 1:51 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,14
Monday, May 23, 2016
14 14 order Order Mon 05/23 2:35 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings. Related [+] Order Signed on 5/23/2016. (LCN)
Related: [-] 1664
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Mon 05/23 12:08 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 05/23 11:00 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
11 11 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Fri 05/20 2:58 PM
Certificate of No Objection to Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, May 02, 2016
10 10 motion Approve - Motion Mon 05/02 4:25 PM
Motion to Approve // Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Trustee to Employ APS International as Agent to Serve Certain Complaints and Summonses Upon the Defendants in Certain Adversary Proceedings; (II) Finding that the Deadline to Serve the Complaints and Summonses Does Not Apply to the Adversary Proceedings or, Alternatively, Extending the Deadline for Service of the Complaints and Summonses; (III) Setting a Deadline for Each of the Defendants to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; and (IV) Scheduling the Initial Pretrial Conference for the Adversary Proceedings Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/18/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 04/22 3:25 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 10:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
7 7 order Order Tue 04/12 8:59 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 4/11/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 04/11 1:55 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Revised Form of Order with respect to Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/31 12:59 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, March 24, 2016
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/24 5:37 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant GTL Asia Limited. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 03/23 4:15 PM
Motion to Approve // Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/8/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 19, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 03/19 12:39 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50400 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7940742, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Sat 03/19 12:18 PM
Adversary case 16-50400 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee against GTL Asia Limited. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/17/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A