Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10867

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-50403
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2016
Terminated:May 11, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Matrix Clothing Pvt. Ltd.
Represented By
Matrix Clothing Pvt. Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, May 11, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/11 9:49 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-50403 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/10 4:24 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
16 16 notice Mediation - Notice Mon 04/10 8:40 AM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Francis A. Monaco, Jr. (Monaco, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2016
15 15 claims|notice Request for Service of Notices|Appearance - Notice Mon 12/05 1:49 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service., Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Matrix Clothing Pvt. Ltd.. (Bothe, Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 04, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/05 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, December 02, 2016
13 13 court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Fri 12/02 9:27 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Francis A. Monaco, Jr. is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2016. (SJS)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, December 01, 2016
12 12 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Thu 12/01 2:14 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
11 11 misc Status Report Wed 08/24 6:12 PM
Status Report Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Proceedings Assigned to the Honorable Brendan L. Shannon Filed by Peter Kravitz, As Liquidating Trustee of the CWC Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/10 11:35 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Matrix Clothing Pvt. Ltd. Mediation due date: 10/11/2016. (Eversden, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 04/22 3:25 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/22 10:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
7 7 order Order Tue 04/12 8:59 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings. Signed on 4/11/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Mon 04/11 1:55 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Revised Form of Order with respect to Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Thu 03/31 2:04 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, James)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, March 24, 2016
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 03/24 5:24 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Matrix Clothing Pvt. Ltd.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 5/23/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Wednesday, March 23, 2016
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 03/23 4:15 PM
Motion to Approve // Liquidating Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2016 at 09:45 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/8/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 19, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 03/19 12:39 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-50403 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7940742, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Sat 03/19 12:26 PM
Adversary case 16-50403 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee against Matrix Clothing Pvt. Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 06/17/2016. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A