Original Case: 4:14-cv-00630

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-01689
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2016
Terminated:Dec 08, 2016
Last checked: Friday Dec 09, 2016 2:28 AM CST
Defendant
David Kenner, in his official capacity as Secretary-Attorney and a member of the Board of Police Commissioners
Defendant - Appellee
Officer John D. Matthews, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Diane F. Chirnside
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Samuel Kyle Atkinson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Officer Francis D. Collins, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Diane F. Chirnside
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Samuel Kyle Atkinson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Alvin Brooks, in his official capacity as President and a member of the Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Samuel Kyle Atkinson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Rader, in his official capacity as Vice President and a member of the Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Samuel Kyle Atkinson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Angela Wasson-Hunt, in her official capacity as Treasurer and a member of the Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Samuel Kyle Atkinson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Sylvester "Sly" James, in his official capacity as a member of the Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By
Samuel Kyle Atkinson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Mr. Darryl Forte, in his official capacity as Police Chief of the Kansas City, Missouri Police Department
Represented By
Samuel Kyle Atkinson
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Shahryar Gilani
Represented By
Jamie Kathryn Lansford
ARTHUR BENSON & ASSOCIATES
contact info
Arthur Benson
ARTHUR BENSON & ASSOCIATES
contact info

GPO Dec 08 2016
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Steven M. Colloton, Michael J. Melloy and Bobby E. Shepherd
AUTHORING JUDGE:Bobby E. Shepherd (PUBLISHED) [4477293] [16-1689]

Docket last updated: 12/09/2016 2:28 AM CST
Monday, March 21, 2016
Civil case docketed. [4379749] 16-1689 (DMW)
Related: [-]
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment 2-16-16. [4379758] 16-1689 (DMW)
Related: [-]
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Appendix due on 05/02/2016. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Shahryar Gilani due 05/02/2016.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4379763] 16-1689 (DMW)
Related: [-]
APPEARANCE filed by Arthur A. Benson II for Appellant Shahryar Gilani w/service 03/21/2016 [4379833] 16-1689 (AB)
Related: [-]
APPEARANCE filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford for Appellant Shahryar Gilani w/service 03/21/2016 [4379836] 16-1689 (JKL)
Related: [-]
Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Shahryar Gilani. No Transcript [4379852] 16-1689 (JKL)
Related: [-]
Civil case docketed. [4379749] 16-1689 (DMW)
Related: [-]
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment 2-16-16. [4379758] 16-1689 (DMW)
Related: [-]
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Appendix due on 05/02/2016. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Shahryar Gilani due 05/02/2016.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4379763] 16-1689 (DMW)
Related: [-]
APPEARANCE filed by Arthur A. Benson II for Appellant Shahryar Gilani w/service 03/21/2016 [4379833] 16-1689 (AB)
Related: [-]
APPEARANCE filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford for Appellant Shahryar Gilani w/service 03/21/2016 [4379836] 16-1689 (JKL)
Related: [-]
Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Shahryar Gilani. No Transcript [4379852] 16-1689 (JKL)
Related: [-]