Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Greg Kays
Case #: 4:14-cv-00630
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2014
Terminated:Feb 16, 2016
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 3:33 PM CDT
Defendant
Officer Francis D. Collins
Represented By
S Kyle Atkinson
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Jc
contact info
Diane F. Chirnside
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info
Dion F Sankar
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info
Defendant
Officer John D. Matthews
Represented By
S Kyle Atkinson
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Jc
contact info
Diane F. Chirnside
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info
Dion F Sankar
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info
Defendant
Alvin Brooks
Represented By
Dion F Sankar
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info
Defendant
Mr. Darryl Forte
in his official capacity as Police Chief of the Kansas City, Missouri Police Department Chief of Police 1125 Locust
Kansas City, MO 64106
Represented By
Dion F Sankar
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info
Defendant
Sylvester "Sly" James
Represented By
Dion F Sankar
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info
Defendant
Michael Rader
Represented By
Dion F Sankar
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info
Defendant
Angela Wasson-Hunt
Represented By
Dion F Sankar
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info
Plaintiff
Shahryar Gilani
Represented By
Jamie Kathryn Lansford
Arthur Benson & Associates
contact info
Arthur A. Benson
Arthur Benson & Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
David Kenner
Terminated: 03/13/2015
Represented By
Dion F Sankar
Missouri Attorney General'S Office-Kc
contact info

GPO Feb 16 2016
ORDER granting 54 defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed on 2/16/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)

Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Friday, February 03, 2017
73 73 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 02/03 11:02 AM
MANDATE of US COURT OF APPEALS as to69 Notice of Appeal filed by Shahryar Gilani with mandate issued on 1/31/2017. (Houston, Kiambu)
Related: [-]