Randle v. Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Referred: | Barry A Bryant |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-04025 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:1981 Housing Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 19, 2016 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
RichSmith Development LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chimeka Randle
12 Ferguson St.
Texarkana, AR 71854 |
Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 09/20 11:50 AM
MANDATE of USCA affirming district court decision as to29 Notice of Appeal filed by Chimeka Randle. (mll) |
|
Att: 1 8USCA Judgment | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
USCA Order Requesting Record
Wed 03/22 1:31 PM
ORDER of USCA requesting any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER be submitted within 10 days. There are no documents to send. (mll) |
|
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 03/22 1:21 PM
USCA Case Number 17-1612 8th Circuit Court of Appeals for29 Notice of Appeal filed by Chimeka Randle. (mll) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
NOA Supplement Form
Mon 03/13 9:19 AM
NOA SUPPLEMENT FORM re29 Notice of Appeal filed by Chimeka Randle. (mll) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation of Mailing
Mon 03/13 9:21 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION OF MAILING:32 NOA Supplement Form was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant Chimeka Randle on 3/13/2017. (mll) |
||
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/08 4:07 PM
ORDER denying30 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 8, 2017. (mll) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation of Mailing
Wed 03/08 4:09 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION OF MAILING:31 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant Chimeka Randle on 3/8/2017. (mll) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/02 10:56 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Chimeka Randle. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(mll) |
|
29 | 29
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 03/02 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to28 Order of Dismissal by Chimeka Randle. (mll) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 02/06 11:40 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 6, 2017. (mll) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation of Mailing
Mon 02/06 11:42 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION OF MAILING:28 Order of Dismissal was mailed to non-ECF Case Participant Chimeka Randle on 2/6/2017. (mll) |
||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 12/05 11:29 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff's failure to participate in the framing of a discovery plan in this case. Show Cause Response due by 12/22/2016. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 5, 2016. (mll) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 11/17 4:11 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority.(Moore, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - September 9, 2016 letter | ||
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/23 2:48 PM
ORDER Adopting23 Report and Recommendations and denying17 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 23, 2016. (tg) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Sanctions
Fri 08/05 12:40 PM
ORDER denying19 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 5, 2016. (mll) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 08/05 12:37 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority filed by Chimeka Randle. Objections to R&R due by 8/22/2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on August 5, 2016. (mll) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 08/04 1:25 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority filed by Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority. (Moore, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 08/03 10:03 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service,17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority,19 MOTION for Sanctions RESPONSE TO DOCS., 17, 18, AND 19 FILED BY PLAINTIFF filed by RichSmith Development LLC. (Gray, Alex) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Tue 07/26 11:03 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held by 9/9/2016. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 10/4/2016. Bench Trial set for the week of 7/24/2017 in Texarkana -- 3rd flr (AR side) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 26, 2016. (rwg) |
|
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/26 11:07 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Full Pretrial/Dispositive Motions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 26, 2016. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(rwg) |
||
Friday, July 22, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Sanctions
Fri 07/22 2:53 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by Chimeka Randle. (mll) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Response
Fri 07/22 2:51 PM
RESPONSE by Chimeka Randle re15 Answer to Complaint. (mll) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 07/21 3:02 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority by Chimeka Randle. (mll) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/13 9:40 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by RichSmith Development LLC.(Gray, Alex) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/10 4:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by RichSmith Development LLC.(Gray, Alex) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/09 3:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority.(Moore, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/09 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Moore on behalf of Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority. (Moore, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 03, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/03 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chimeka Randle. Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority served on 5/23/2016, answer due 6/13/2016. (mll) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/01 10:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chimeka Randle. RichSmith Development LLC served on 5/23/2016, answer due 6/13/2016. (mll) |
|
Tuesday, May 10, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/10 3:16 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Issued as to RichSmith Development LLC, Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority and USM285 Forms Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re 1 Complaint, 8 Addendum, 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent 9 Order on Motion for Service. (mll) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Service
Tue 05/10 2:54 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on RichSmith Development LLC, Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 10, 2016. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Addendum
Fri 05/06 9:23 AM
ADDENDUM by Chimeka Randle to1 Complaint. (mll) |
|
Thursday, April 07, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Directing Response
Thu 04/07 9:51 AM
ORDER directing the Plaintiff to complete, sign and return the attached Addendum to the1 Complaint by May 7, 2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 7, 2016. (mll) |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/06 2:29 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The matter of service will be considered at a later date. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 6, 2016. (mll) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 04/06 1:49 PM
RESPONSE re4 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed. (mll) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Directing Pleading to be Filed
Thu 03/24 11:04 AM
ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP be filed. Completed IFP due by 4/11/2016. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 24, 2016. (mll) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished
Wed 03/23 3:18 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (mll) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis Service
Wed 03/23 3:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Chimeka Randle. (mll) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/23 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT against RichSmith Development LLC, Texarkana Arkansas Housing Authority filed by Chimeka Randle. (mll) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Wed 03/23 3:14 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. (mll) |