Original Case: 2:12-cv-00928

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-00964
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2016
Terminated:Jun 13, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Jun 15, 2017 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Haas & Najarian
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Sara Spiegelman
Wachtel & Masyr, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Haas & Najarian, LLP
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Sara Spiegelman
Wachtel & Masyr, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Abcon Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Charles Hamburger
Hamburger, Maxson, Yaffe & McNally, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/15/2017 4:29 AM EDT
Wednesday, March 30, 2016
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Haas & Najarian and Haas & Najarian, LLP, FILED. [1739464] [16-964] [Entered: 03/30/2016 01:51 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Haas & Najarian and Haas & Najarian, LLP, district court docket entry re: receipt # 0207-8492476, FILED.[1739470] [16-964] [Entered: 03/30/2016 01:53 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/29/2016, RECEIVED.[1739476] [16-964] [Entered: 03/30/2016 01:54 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTE: See lead case, 16-916, containing complete set of docket entries.[1739477] [16-964] [Entered: 03/30/2016 01:55 PM]
Related: [-]