New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonard D Wexler
Referred: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Case #: 2:12-cv-00928
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2012
Re-opened:Jul 07, 2017
Terminated:Aug 29, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Dec 17, 2016 7:23 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Haas & Najarian
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Sara G. Spiegelman
Wachtel & Missry, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Haas & Najarian, LLP
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Sara G. Spiegelman
Wachtel & Missry, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Abcon Associates, Inc.,
Represented By
Richard C. Hamburger
Hamburger, Maxson, Yaffe & Mcnally, LLP
contact info
Seth Alan Levine
Richman & Levine, P.C.
contact info
Keith H. Richman
Richman & Levine, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Haas & Najarian
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Sara G. Spiegelman
Wachtel & Missry, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Haas & Najarian, LLP
Represented By
Jeffrey T. Strauss
Wachtel Missry LLP
contact info
Sara G. Spiegelman
Wachtel & Missry, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Abcon Associates, Inc.,
Represented By
Richard C. Hamburger
Hamburger, Maxson, Yaffe & Mcnally, LLP
contact info
Seth Alan Levine
Richman & Levine, P.C.
contact info
Keith H. Richman
Richman & Levine, P.C.
contact info

GPO Oct 06 2014
ORDER denying 75 Motion for Sanctions. Defendants' motion for the imposition of sanctions based on spoliation is DENIED. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 10/6/2014. (Kandel, Erin)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.