Member Case
Lead case is: 5:16-bk-50778

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:16-bk-50794
Case Filed:Apr 04, 2016
Terminated:Dec 20, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 12/22 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/22/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Granting Monitor's Motion to Close Chapter 15 Debtors' Cases with Final Report Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P.5009(c) (related document(s):7 Monitor's Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Debtors' Chapter 15 Cases with Final Report Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 5009(c)] (30 Day Objection Language ) filed by Patrick L. Huffstickler for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative) (Order entered on 12/20/2021)
Monday, December 20, 2021
9 9 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Mon 12/20 3:23 PM
Order Granting Monitor's Motion to Close Chapter 15 Debtors' Cases with Final Report Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P.5009(c) Related [+] (Order entered on 12/20/2021) (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-] 7 Monitor's Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Debtors' Chapter 15 Cases with Final Report Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 5009(c)] (30 Day Objection Language ) filed by Patrick L. Huffstickler for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 12/20 3:23 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Gonzalez, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
8 8 misc ~Document Tue 11/16 12:11 PM
Certificate of the Monitor and Foreign Representative That Notice of the Monitor's Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Debtors' Chapter 15 Cases with Final Report Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 5009(c) Has Been Given Pursuant to Rule 5009(c) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by Patrick L. Huffstickler for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative. (Huffstickler, Patrick) Related [+]
Related: [-] 7 Motion [Monitor's Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Debtors' Chapter 15 Cases with Final Report Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 5009(c)] (30 Day Objection Language ) filed by Patrick L. Huffstickler for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative
Monday, November 15, 2021
7 7 motion ~Motion (Generic) Mon 11/15 4:25 PM
Motion [Monitor's Motion to Close the Chapter 15 Debtors' Chapter 15 Cases with Final Report Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 5009(c)] (30 Day Objection Language ) filed by Patrick L. Huffstickler for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative (Huffstickler, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2016
6 6 crbatch Notice Withdraw Claim (batch) Thu 05/19 10:11 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Claim By Texas Workforce Commmission. (Crawford, Janaha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
court Event (public) Wed 04/06 11:21 AM
Court Public Entry: Court Entry: An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the Chapter 15 cases of Sanjel (USA) Inc., Sanjel Corporation, Suretech Group Ltd., Sanjel Energy Services (USA), Suretech Completions (USA), Sanjel Capital (USA) Inc., Terracor Group Ltd., Terracor (USA) Inc., Terracor Resources (USA), Inc. and Terracor Logistics (USA) Inc. The docket in the Chapter 15 case of Sanjel Corporation, Case No. 16-50778 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
5 5 order BK-Jointly Administering Cases (pdf) Tue 04/05 3:40 PM
Order Jointly Administering Cases, Lead Case Number 16-50778 Related [+] (Order entered on 4/5/2016) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 2 Emergency Motion For Joint Administration filed by Deborah D. Williamson for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative (Williamson, Deborah) Modified on 4/5/2016 .
4 4 order BK-Regarding Matter (pdf) Tue 04/05 8:27 AM
Order Regarding Related [+] (Order entered on 4/5/2016) (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Deborah D. Williamson for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Williamson, Deborah) (Related Document(s):2 Emergency Motion to Consolidate filed by Deborah D. Williamson for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative)
court Hearing Held Wed 04/06 1:10 PM
Hearing Held: ***GRANTED*** . Related [+] (Esquivel, Maria)
Related: [-] 2 Emergency Motion For Joint Administration filed by Deborah D. Williamson for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative .
Monday, April 04, 2016
3 3 motion Expedite Hearing Mon 04/04 7:41 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Deborah D. Williamson for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative(Williamson, Deborah) Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Emergency Motion to Consolidate filed by Deborah D. Williamson for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 motion Consolidate or Jointly Administer Cases Mon 04/04 7:39 PM
Emergency Motion to Consolidate filed by Deborah D. Williamson for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative (Williamson, Deborah)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Chapter 15 Mon 04/04 1:50 PM
Chapter 15 - Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding; Without Schedules and Statements, ( Filing Fee: $ 1717.00 ) Filed By Terracor Logistics (USA) Inc.. (Williamson, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
court Hearing (NO FORM) Mon 04/04 7:57 PM
Hearing to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Hearing Scheduled For 4/5/2016 at 08:00 AM at SA Courtroom 3 ***SET ON EXPEDITED BASIS, DEBORAH WILLIAMSON SHALL GIVE NOTICE OF THE HEARING*** (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 2 Emergency Motion to Consolidate filed by Deborah D. Williamson for Foreign Representative PricewaterhouseCoopers Inc., Canadian Monitor and Foreign Representative