Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Jacqueline Becerra
Case #: 1:16-cv-21203
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2016
Terminated:Feb 06, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Oct 02, 2016 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Anastasia Beverly Hills, Inc.
Represented By
Alan Graham Greer
Richman Greer, P.A.
contact info
Travis R. Wimberly
Pirkey Barber, PLLC
contact info
Nathaniel Mark Edenfield
Richman Greer, P.A.
contact info
Mark Anthony Romance
Richman Greer, P.A.
contact info
Louis T. Pirkey
Pirkey Barber LLP
contact info
Mediator
Leslie J. Lott
Plaintiff
Hard Candy, LLC
Represented By
Gabriel Groisman
Coffey Burlington, P.L.
contact info
Erika Stephanie Handelson
Jones Day
contact info
Kevin Crow Kaplan
Coffey Burlington, P.L.
contact info

GPO Jan 13 2018
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion Testimony and Report of Christopher A. Martinez 44. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 1/13/2018. (par) Modified by Unsealing Document pursuant to 149 Order on 1/25/2018 (nc).

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 23, 2020
210 210 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Mon 03/23 4:31 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting189 Motion to Reinstate; denying200 Motion for Attorney Fees; Adopting and Affirming208 Report and Recommendations; denying179 motion for attorney fees Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 03/23 3:38 PM
Motions terminated:193 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/23/2020. (clu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
209 209 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/17 1:35 PM
NOTICE by Anastasia Beverly Hills, Inc. re208 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re200 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Anastasia Beverly Hills, Inc.,179 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Anastasia Beverly Hi Regarding Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation [ECF 208] (Romance, Mark)
Related: [-]