Original Case: 1:16-cv-21203

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-prici-10877
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2018
Last checked: Friday Mar 09, 2018 3:19 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
ANASTASIA BEVERLY HILLS, INC., a California Corporation
Represented By
Nathaniel M. Edenfield
Richman Greer, PA
contact info
Alan Graham Greer
Richman Greer, PA
contact info
Mark A. Romance
Richman Greer, PA
contact info
Travis R. Wimberly
Pirkey Barber, LLP
contact info
Louis Pirkey
Pirkey Barber, LLP
contact info
Jered Matthysse
Pirkey Barber, LLP
contact info
Stephen P. Meleen
Pirkey Barber, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HARD CANDY, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
Represented By
John P. Margiotta
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, PC
contact info
Kevin C. Kaplan
Coffey Burlington, PL
contact info
Frances Elizabeth Blake
Coffey Burlington, PL
contact info
Gabriel Groisman
Groisman, PLLC
contact info
Jason D. Jones
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, PC
contact info

GPO Apr 23 2019
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Hard Candy, LLC. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.

Docket last updated: 03/09/2018 3:19 AM EST
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Hard Candy, LLC on 03/05/2018. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/20/2018 as to Appellant Hard Candy, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/03/2018 as to Appellee Anastasia Beverly Hills, Inc.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice of Appeal DE#162
Att: 2 1 pgs Order DE#104
Att: 3 2 pgs Judgment DE#160
Att: 4 2 pgs DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties