Peabody Coulterville Mining, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Lead case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barry S Schermer |
Case #: | 4:16-bk-42550 |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Peabody Coulterville Mining, LLC
701 Market St Ste 723
Saint Louis, MO 63101-1830 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago |
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
court
Bounce Back E-mails
Mon 08/08 4:08 PM
Notice: Sharity Woods, from Illinois Department of Revenue/Bankruptcy Unit, will no longer receive service using the CM/ECF system. If Illinois Department of Revenue/Bankruptcy Unit, is to receive notice, service must be made by other means. (pri, m) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Final Decree
Thu 06/28 9:34 AM
Final Decree Closing the Chapter 11 cases of two of the Reorganized Debtors (cro, d) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 06/28 9:35 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (cro, d) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Withdraw Document
Mon 09/11 9:30 AM
Withdrawal of Document Filed by Debtor Peabody Coulterville Mining, LLC . (Woods, Sharity) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Fri 09/08 10:32 AM
Withdrawal of Claim Nos. 23 (Illinois Department of Revenue), 24 (Illinois Department of Revenue) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
Document
Thu 04/21 3:02 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of this case with that of Peabody Energy Corporation, Case No. 16-42529 399. The Chapter 11 case of Peabody Energy Corporation should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (cro, d) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 04/15 9:11 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . (cro, d) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/13 3:23 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-42550 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 269680, amount $1717.00. (oll) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11)
Wed 04/13 3:02 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Peabody Coulterville Mining, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 10/11/2016. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/11/2016. Disclosure Statement due by 08/11/2016. (Zimmerman, Andrew) |