Peabody Trout Creek Reservoir LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Lead case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barry S Schermer |
Case #: | 4:16-bk-42622 |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 05, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Final Decree
Thu 10/05 1:27 PM
Final Decree Closing The Chapter 11 Cases of 61 of the Reorganized Debtors. (pas, s) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 10/05 2:03 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (pas, s) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Withdraw Document
Mon 05/08 3:32 PM
Withdrawal of Document Filed by Creditor T Mobile . (Boswell, Ashley) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Wed 05/03 8:31 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 1 Filed by Creditor T Mobile/T-Mobile USA Inc by American InfoSource L (Hogan, Blake) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
Document
Thu 04/21 3:47 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of this case with that of Peabody Energy Corporation, Case No. 16-42529 399. The Chapter 11 case of Peabody Energy Corporation should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (cro, d) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 04/15 11:31 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration.(pas, s) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/13 3:39 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-42622 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 269680, amount $1717.00. (oll) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11)
Wed 04/13 5:47 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Peabody Trout Creek Reservoir LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 10/11/2016. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/11/2016. Disclosure Statement due by 08/11/2016. (LeMoine, Bruce) |