Peabody Venture Fund, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Lead case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barry S Schermer |
Case #: | 4:16-bk-42637 |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Peabody Venture Fund, LLC
701 Market St Ste 758
Saint Louis, MO 63101-1830 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago |
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Final Decree
Thu 11/16 9:39 AM
Final decree closing the Chapter 11 cases of 18 of the Reorganized Debtors (cro, d) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 11/16 9:39 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (cro, d) |
||
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
Document
Thu 04/21 3:53 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of this case with that of Peabody Energy Corporation, Case No. 16-42529 399. The Chapter 11 case of Peabody Energy Corporation should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (cro, d) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 04/15 10:45 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration. (pas, s) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/13 3:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-42637 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 269680, amount $1717.00. (oll) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11)
Wed 04/13 6:25 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Peabody Venture Fund, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 10/11/2016. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/11/2016. Disclosure Statement due by 08/11/2016. (Cousins, Steven) |