Peabody Powder River Mining, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Lead case is: 4:16-bk-42529
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barry S Schermer |
Case #: | 4:16-bk-42666 |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Final Decree
Thu 04/05 12:56 PM
Final Decree closing the Chapter 11 cases of Nine of the Reorganized Debtors. (crod) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 04/05 12:57 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (cro, d) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Withdraw Document
Mon 11/13 1:23 PM
Withdrawal of Document Filed by Creditors Maria Luciano Pelayo, Victor Pelayo . (Macdonald, Cherie) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 11/13 10:40 AM
Certificate of Service AMENDED Filed by Creditors Maria Luciano Pelayo, Victor Pelayo . (Macdonald, Cherie) |
|
5 | 5
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Mon 11/13 10:05 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 58 Filed by Creditors Maria Luciano Pelayo, Victor Pelayo (Macdonald, Cherie) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
Document
Thu 04/21 4:09 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of this case with that of Peabody Energy Corporation, Case No. 16-42529 399. The Chapter 11 case of Peabody Energy Corporation should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (cro, d) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 04/15 8:57 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration. (pas, s) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/13 3:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-42666 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 269680, amount $1717.00. (oll) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11)
Wed 04/13 7:42 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Peabody Powder River Mining, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 10/11/2016. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/11/2016. Disclosure Statement due by 08/11/2016. (Odlum, Angela) |