Oklahoma Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terrence L Michael
Case #: 4:16-bk-10678
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2016
Creditor Meeting:May 18, 2016
Claims Deadline:Sep 09, 2016
Terminated:Dec 23, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Dec 30, 2016

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sheehan Pipe Line Construction Company
2431 E 61st St Ste 700
Tulsa, OK 74136-1234
Represented By
Mary E. Kindelt
Mcdonald, Mccann & Metcalf, LLP
contact info
Gary M. McDonald
Mcdonald, Mccann & Metcalf, LLP
contact info
Chad J. Kutmas
Mcdonald, Mccann & Metcalf, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
224 South Boulder Avenue Suite 225
Tulsa, OK 74103


1. Sheehan Pipeline Construction Company files for bankruptcy (tulsaworld.com)
Submitted Tue 04/26/2016
Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 12:02 PM CDT
Thursday, April 21, 2022
1315 1315 court Notice of Undeliverable E-mail Thu 04/21 10:29 AM
Notice of Undeliverable E-mail. On 4/21/2022, Amended Claims #8-3 and #9-3 were filed by John Deere Financial, f.s.b. f/k/a FPC Financial, f.s.b.. Although the NEFs associated with Amended Claims #8-3 and #9-3, show Samuel Joseph Merchant was served electronically at sam.merchant@mcafeetaft.com, those messages were returned to the ECF system as undeliverable. This entry serves as notice to the filer under Local Rule 9004-1(F)(2) that the Amended Claims #8-3 and #9-3, were not served on Samuel Joseph Merchant by the ECF system. (TS)
Related: [-]