Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:16-bk-10678

Oklahoma Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terrence L Michael
Case #: 4:18-ap-01023
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2018
Terminated:Nov 07, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cathy Rice, Defendant
3325 S. 144 East Place
Tulsa, OK 74131
Represented By
Cathy Rice
contact info
Plaintiff
Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust, Plaintiff
Frederic Dorwart Lawyers PLLC 124 East Fourth Street
Tulsa, OK 74103
Represented By
Samuel Scott Ory
Frederic Dorwart, Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:09 PM CDT
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
9 9 court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/07 2:01 PM
Adversary Proceeding 4:18-ap-1023 Closed . (B, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 20, 2018
8 8 misc Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/20 5:03 PM
Joint Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice . Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Sam G. Bratton II, Samuel Scott Ory on behalf of Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust. (Ory, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
7 7 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/25 3:07 PM
Scheduling Conference Order. Pre-Trial Order due by 10/22/2018. Discovery shall be completed on or before 9/21/2018. (B, Jo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Form 1 Form Pre-Trial Order
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
6 6 atom Telephonic Scheduling Order Wed 05/23 1:16 PM
Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A telephonic scheduling conference shall be held on 6/27/2018 at 10:40 AM. The Court shall initiate the telephone call to the parties. Further instructions governing this hearing are contained in the document attached hereto and are incorporated herein by this reference. BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Terrence L. Michael. (B, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/15 4:14 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Sam G. Bratton II on behalf of Cathy Rice. (Bratton, Sam)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, April 16, 2018
4 4 court Summons Issued Mon 04/16 9:31 AM
Summons Issued (B, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 13, 2018
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/13 4:09 PM
Civil Cover Sheet Filed by Samuel Scott Ory on behalf of Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust. (Ory, Samuel)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 04/13 4:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01023 M) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 4037329. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/13 4:05 PM
Complaint by Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust vs. Cathy Rice. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: 13 Related [+],14. Filed by Samuel Scott Ory on behalf of Sheehan Pipe Line Liquidating Trust. (Ory, Samuel)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other