Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jerry A Funk
Case #: 3:09-bk-07047
Case Filed:Aug 24, 2009
Creditor Meeting:Oct 27, 2009
Claims Deadline:Jun 15, 2010
Terminated:Feb 21, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Jul 21, 2011

Debtor
Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.
4901 Vineland Rd Ste 120
Orlando, FL 32811-7187
Represented By
Edward J. Peterson, III
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA
contact info
James D Dantzler, Jr
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Russell M Blain
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser
contact info
James D. Gassenheimer
Berger Singerman. P.A.
contact info
Alisa Paige Mason
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Amy Denton Harris
Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser PA
contact info
Brian M Guertin
Law Offices Of Daniel C. Consuegra
contact info
Jeffrey W Kelley
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Liquidating Trustee
Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust
Bank of America Plaza 600 Peachtree Street, N.E. Suite 5200
Atlanta, GA 30308
Represented By
Edward J. Peterson, III
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA
contact info
James D Dantzler, Jr
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
James D. Gassenheimer
Berger Singerman. P.A.
contact info
Michael J Hooi
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info
Jeffrey W Kelley
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Trustee
Neil F. Luria
Represented By
Edward J. Peterson, III
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA
contact info
Arthur J Spector
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Debi Evans Galler
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
James D. Gassenheimer
Berger Singerman. P.A.
contact info
Alisa Paige Mason
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Paul Steven Singerman
Berger Singerman, PA
contact info
Trustee
Plan Trustee for Taylor, Bean and Whitaker
Represented By
James D Gassenheimer
Berger Singerman. P.A.
contact info
Arthur J Spector
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Alisa Paige Mason
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Jeffrey W Kelley
Troutman Sanders LLP
contact info
Trustee
Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee
Represented By
Edward J. Peterson, III
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, PA
contact info
Russell M Blain
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser
contact info
Arthur J Spector
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Debi Evans Galler
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
James D. Gassenheimer
Berger Singerman. P.A.
contact info
Alisa Paige Mason
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Paul Steven Singerman
Berger Singerman, PA
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - JAX 11, 11
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801
Represented By
Elena L Escamilla
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Creditor Committee
Creditors Committee
Terminated: 07/21/2011
Represented By
David L Gay
Berger Singerman, PA
contact info
James D Gassenheimer
Berger Singerman. P.A.
contact info
Arthur J Spector
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Debi Evans Galler
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Alisa Paige Mason
Berger Singerman PA
contact info
Paul Steven Singerman
Berger Singerman, PA
contact info
Defendant
Dimension Data
Terminated: 07/19/2013
800 West Monroe Street
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Alessandro A Apolito
Brennan Manna & Diamond Pl
contact info
Defendant
RLI Insurance Company
Terminated: 07/22/2013
Wargo & French LLP 201 S. Biscayne Blvd. Suite 1000
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Matthew I Rochman
Wargo & French LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
8983 8983 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Mon 12/16 2:46 PM
Notice of Extension of Plan Trust Pursuant to Court Order Entered on February 21, 2020 Authorizing Further Extension of Plan Trust Without Reopening Cases Filed by Paul Steven Singerman on behalf of Trustee Neil F. Luria. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]