Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:09-bk-07047

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jerry A Funk
Case #: 3:11-ap-00642
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2011
Dismissed:Jul 28, 2015
Terminated:Jul 29, 2015
Last checked: never
Defendant
Urban Trust Bank
Represented By
Todd M Hoepker
Todd M Hoepker PA
contact info
Joseph D Foley, Jr
Joseph Dayton Foley, Jr. P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee
Represented By
Paul Steven Singerman
Berger Singerman, LLP
contact info
Ilyse M Homer
Berger Singerman, PA
contact info
James D. Gassenheimer
Berger Singerman. P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
84 84 misc Certificate Of Service Tue 08/04 11:12 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice. Filed by Todd M Hoepker on behalf of Defendant Urban Trust Bank Related [+]. (Hoepker, Todd)
Related: [-] 83
Monday, August 03, 2015
court ADI Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day Mon 08/03 12:18 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order83 is not indicated on the docket. Todd Hoepker is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
court Close Adversary Case Wed 07/29 12:35 PM
Adversary Case 3:11-ap-642 Closed. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
83 83 order Order Dismissing Adversary Tue 07/28 11:54 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary with Prejudice Related [+]. Service Instructions: Todd Hoepker is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 82