NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Friedman |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00745 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2016 |
Case in other court: | USCA for the Federal Circuit, 19-01083-SJ USCA for the Federal Circuit, 18-00154-CP USCA for the Federal Circuit, 18-00155-CP USCA for the Federal Circuit, 19-01081-SJ 21-05291 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 18, 2016 5:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM
1600 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
174 | 174
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit
Wed 04/24 4:51 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed ( Opinion), and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit. The appeal fee was paid re173 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. (zjm) |
|
173 | 173
appeal
Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit
Wed 04/24 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to170 Order,169 Opinion by ERIC ALAN ISAACSON. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number 207171. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zjm) |
|
172 | 172
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 04/24 4:24 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed ( Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re171 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zjm) Modified on 4/24/2024 (zjm) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
171 | 171
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Wed 04/24 4:22 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to170 Memorandum & Opinion,, Order,169 Memorandum & Opinion by ERIC ALAN ISAACSON. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number 207171. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zjm) Modified on 4/24/2024 (zjm) |