National Veterans Legal Services Program, et al v. USA
Original Case: 1:16-cv-00745
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cvus-05291 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 29, 2022 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Movant - Appellant
Michael T. Pines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
National Veterans Legal Services Program
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
National Consumer Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Alliance for Justice
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/29/2022 4:31 AM EDT |
Tuesday, December 21, 2021 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 21-5291 | ||
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1927634] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70210350000186795794] of order [1927629-2]. Certified Mail Receipt due 01/20/2022 from Michael T. Pines. 21-5291 | ||
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1927625] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-00745-PLF filed by Michael T. Pines. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5291 21-5291 | ||
1 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1927629] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 01/20/2022, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 21-5291 |