PRATER et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA HEALTH DISTRICTS et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Juan R Sanchez |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01976 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 19, 2016 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA HEALTH DISTRICTS
|
|
Defendant
DR. JANE DOE
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOE
|
|
Defendant
ROBIN DOE
|
|
Defendant
RITA EBURUOH
|
|
Defendant
JANE DOE HOLLOWAY
|
|
Defendant
DEBRA G. SPEYER
|
|
Defendant
DR. THOMAS STOREY
|
|
Defendant
DARNELL WILKERSON
|
|
Plaintiff
CHARMAINE PRATER
PO BOX 3288
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19130 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
ELLA MASSARD PRATER
Terminated: 05/13/2016
INCOMPETENT MOTHER ET AL. PO BOX 3288
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19130 |
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 04/03 3:09 PM
ORDER of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal filed by CHARMAINE PRATER. Ordered that this case is hereby dismissed for failure to timely prosecute insofar as appellant failed to file a brief and appendix as directed. It is further ordered that a certified copy of this order be issued in lieu of a formal mandate. (mbh, ) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Wed 11/15 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re10 Notice of Appeal filed by CHARMAINE PRATER. USCA Case Number 17-3468 (dmc, ) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 11/09 8:58 AM
Notice of Appeal filed by CHARMAINE PRATER. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk. No filing fee paid. IFP granted on 5/13/16 (mbh, ) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Mon 10/16 9:53 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO OPEN AND REINSTATE CASE TO PROCEED IS GRANTED. THE MOTION TO OPEN AND REINSTATE CASE TO PROCEED AND THE PRAECIPE ARE CONSTRUED AS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM, THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/13/17. 10/16/17 ENTERED AND COPIES TO PRO SE PARTIES.(mbh, ) |
|
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Mon 10/16 9:45 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/13/17. 10/16/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(mbh, ) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Praecipe/Request
Mon 10/02 8:58 AM
Praecipe filed by CHARMAINE PRATER. (mbh, ) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Reinstate
Fri 09/29 4:27 PM
MOTION TO OPEN AND REINSTATE CASE TO PROCEED FILED BY CHARMAINE PRATER.(mbh, ) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 05/16 11:41 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. CO-PLAINTIFF, ELLA MASSARD PRATER, IS DISMISSED AS A PARTY TO THIS ACTION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL AMEND THE DOCKET TO STRIKE HER NAME FROM THE CAPTION OF THE COMPLAINT. PLAINTIFF CHARMAINE PRATER IS GIVEN LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THIS CASE SHALL REMAIN CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/13/16. 5/16/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Application/Petition
Thu 05/05 11:01 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by CHARMAINE PRATER and ELLA MASSARD PRATER. (mbh, ) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Reinstate
Thu 05/05 10:57 AM
MOTION TO REINSTATE FILED BY CHARMAINE PRATER AND ELLA MASSARD PRATER.(mbh, ) |
|
Thursday, April 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 04/29 9:41 AM
ORDER THT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE STATISTICALLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/28/16. 4/29/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES.(mbh, ) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Application/Petition
Wed 04/27 9:50 AM
VERIFICATION OF NEED FOR CONTINUOUS IFP STATUS THAT WAS GRANTED AT STATE COURT by CHARMAINE PRATER.(jwl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |