LightSquared LP
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:12-bk-12080
Lead case is: 1:12-bk-12080
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:12-bk-12081 |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2012 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2016 |
Type | Partnership |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | More than $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
LightSquared LP
450 Park Ave Ste 2201
New York, NY 10022-2672 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 07, 2016 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 04/07 3:31 PM
Case Closed. (Suarez, Aurea) |
||
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order, Final Decree
Wed 04/06 4:12 PM
Order Entering Final Decree and Closing the Chapter 11 Cases of Lightsquared Inc signed on 4/6/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, August 06, 2014 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Transfer of Claim
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security . Notice Date 08/06/2014. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 17, 2014 | ||
6 | 6
claims
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (NON CLAIMS AGENT CASES)
Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: AnyData Corporation To ASM Capital IV, L.P. claim #132 in the amount $690,000.00 filed by Douglas Wolfe on behalf of ASM Capital IV, L.P.. (Wolfe, Douglas) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Receipt of Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) (NON CLAIMS AGENT CASES) 12-12081 scc) [claims,740] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10215006. Fee amount 25.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, November 18, 2013 | ||
5 | 5 Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed by New York State Department of Labor. (Lopez, Mary) | |
Thursday, September 05, 2013 | ||
4 | 4 Withdrawal of Claim(s): 12-12081SCC/$6,578.37 filed by Bankruptcy Unit Massachusetts Department of Revenue,.(Fienberg, Gina) | |
Thursday, May 17, 2012 | ||
Case Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Proceduredirecting the procedural consolidation and joint administration ofthe chapter 11 cases of LightSquared Inc., LightSquared InvestorsHoldings Inc., One Dot Four Corp., One Dot Six Corp., SkyTerraRollup LLC, SkyTerra Rollup Sub LLC, SkyTerra Investors LLC,TMI Communications Delaware, Limited Partnership,LightSquared GP Inc., LightSquared LP, ATC Technologies, LLC,LightSquared Corp., LightSquared Finance Co., LightSquaredNetwork LLC, LightSquared Inc. of Virginia, LightSquaredSubsidiary LLC, Lightsquared Bermuda, Ltd., SkyTerra Holdings(Canada) Inc., SkyTerra (Canada) Inc. and One Dot Six TVCCCorp. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, Chapter 11 Case No. 12-12080 (SCC). (Cappiello, Karen). | ||
Wednesday, May 16, 2012 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-12081 [misc,824] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 189550. Fee amount 1046.00. (Porter) | ||
Tuesday, May 15, 2012 | ||
3 | 3 Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtor's Chapter 11 Cases; The Docket in Chapter 11 Case 12-12080 (SCC) Should be Consulted for All Matters Concerning this Case signed on 5/15/2012. (Chien, Jason) | |
Monday, May 14, 2012 | ||
2 | 2 Motion for Joint Administration / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Matthew Scott Barr on behalf of LightSquared LP. (Barr, Matthew) | |
1 | 1 21 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Matthew Scott Barr of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy on behalf of LightSquared LP. (Barr, Matthew) | |
Judge Shelley C. Chapman added to the case. (Gomez, Jessica). |