Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:David J Hale
Referred: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Case #: 3:16-cv-00247
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Account Receivable
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2016
Terminated:Sep 30, 2019
Case in other court:Jefferson County Circuit Court, 16-01504 6th Circuit, 17-06290
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 26, 2016 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Alvin Bamberger
Represented By
Stephen Beville Pence
Pence & Whetzell, PLLC
contact info
R. Kent Westberry
Landrum & Shouse, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen Beville Pence
Pence & Whetzell, PLLC
contact info
R. Kent Westberry
Landrum & Shouse, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Matthew John Heimbach
222 Mable Street, Apt 2
Paoli, IN 47454
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Stephen Beville Pence
Pence & Whetzell, PLLC
contact info
R. Kent Westberry
Landrum & Shouse, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Defendant
Plaintiff
Henry Brousseau
Represented By
Daniel J. Canon
Clay Daniel Walton Adams PLC
contact info
Camille A. Bathurst
Belzley Bathurst Attorneys
contact info
Gregory A. Belzley
Belzley Bathurst Attorneys
contact info
David N. Ward
Clay Daniel Walton Adams PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kashiya Nwanguma
Represented By
Daniel J. Canon
Clay Daniel Walton Adams PLC
contact info
Camille A. Bathurst
Belzley Bathurst Attorneys
contact info
Gregory A. Belzley
Belzley Bathurst Attorneys
contact info
David N. Ward
Clay Daniel Walton Adams PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Molly Shah
Represented By
Daniel J. Canon
Clay Daniel Walton Adams PLC
contact info
Camille A. Bathurst
Belzley Bathurst Attorneys
contact info
Gregory A. Belzley
Belzley Bathurst Attorneys
contact info
David N. Ward
Clay Daniel Walton Adams PLC
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale. Motion to dismiss (DN 9) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth. Motion to dismiss (DN 10) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth. Motion to strike (DN 11) is denied. Motion for hearing (DN 24) is denied as moot. Matter referred to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl for litigation planning, scheduling, nondispositive matters, discovery, and settlement. cc: Counsel, HBB-CM(JAC)
GPO Aug 09 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 8/8/2017 - The Trump Defendants' motion to certify the Court's March 31, 2017 Memorandum Opinion and Order for interlocutory appeal or to reconsider that decision (D.N. 36) is GRANTED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b), the Court's March 31, 2017 Memorandum Opinion and Order is AMENDED to certify the following question for immediate appeal: Does the First Amendment protect Donald J. Trumps March 1, 2016 statement "Get 'em out of here," or may the statement be found to constitute incitement of a riot? Count V of Plaintiffs' complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Trump Defendants objection to the magistrate judges denial of their motion to stay discovery pending resolution of the motion to certify (D.N. 46) is OVERRULED as moot. Discovery as to the Trump Defendants shall be STAYED pending resolution of the interlocutory appeal. Discovery as to Bamberger and Heimbach shall proceed as set forth. cc: Counsel(DAK)
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 30, 2019
71 71 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 09/30 8:17 AM
ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 9/27/2019 granting70 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' remaining claims are DISMISSED. All claims having been resolved (D.N.27 ; D.N.58 ; D.N.66 ; D.N.68 ), this matter is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2019
72 72 misc Mail Returned Mon 09/30 4:38 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable, unable to forward. (AME)
Related: [-]
70 70 motion Dismiss Fri 09/27 11:34 AM
MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Show Cause Order by Plaintiffs Henry Brousseau, Kashiya Nwanguma, Molly Shah (Canon, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order