Original Case: 3:16-cv-00247

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-06290
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2017
Terminated:Sep 11, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 12, 2018 5:02 AM CDT
Amicus Curiae
THE LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Represented By
Jon M. Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By
Vivek Suri
Jones Day
contact info
Anthony John Dick
Jones Day
contact info
Michael Anthony Carvin
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.
Represented By
Vivek Suri
Jones Day
contact info
Anthony John Dick
Jones Day
contact info
Michael Anthony Carvin
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KASHIYA NWANGUMA
Represented By
Daniel J. Canon
Law Offices
contact info
Gregory A. Belzley
Law Office
contact info
David N. Ward
Clay, Daniel, Walton & Adams
contact info
Camille Bathurst
Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MOLLY SHAH
Represented By
Daniel J. Canon
Law Offices
contact info
Gregory A. Belzley
Law Office
contact info
David N. Ward
Clay, Daniel, Walton & Adams
contact info
Camille Bathurst
Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HENRY BROUSSEAU
Represented By
Daniel J. Canon
Law Offices
contact info
Gregory A. Belzley
Law Office
contact info
David N. Ward
Clay, Daniel, Walton & Adams
contact info
Camille Bathurst
Law Office
contact info

GPO Sep 11 2018
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : REVERSED and REMANDED. Decision for publication. David W. McKeague (AUTHORING), Richard A Griffin, and Helene N. White (CONCURRING), Circuit Judges.

Docket last updated: 09/12/2018 5:02 AM CDT
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson. (RLJ)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. and Donald J. Trump. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ)
Related: [-]
ATTACHED Copy of petition for permission to appeal in Case No.: 17-510 and copy of 11/01/17 Sixth Circuit Order granting petition for permission to appeal in Case No. 17-510. (RLJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 63 pgs permission to appeal
Att: 2 7 pgs published order